Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2096043

EP2096043 - Transport and storage container for fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.03.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PROTECHNA S.A.
14 Avenue de la gare
1701 Fribourg / CH
[2009/36]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Bahnhofstrasse 4
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Rosenwald 25
57234 Siegen-Wilnsdorf / DE
Application number, filing date09001566.005.02.2009
[2009/36]
Priority number, dateDE2008101142327.02.2008         Original published format: DE102008011423
[2009/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2096043
Date:02.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2096043
Date:13.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65D77/04
[2009/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:Transport- und Lagerbehälter für Flüssigkeiten[2009/36]
English:Transport and storage container for fluids[2009/36]
French:Récipient de transport et de stockage pour liquides[2009/36]
Examination procedure24.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
16.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2010Fee for grant paid
30.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger, et al
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
WERIT-Kunststoffwerke W. Schneider GmbH & Co. KG
Kölner Strasse
57604 Altenkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Geskes, Christoph, et al
Geskes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gustav-Heinemann-Ufer 74b
50968 Köln / DE
 03  13.01.2012  18.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
S.A.S Société Nouvelle Sotralentz Packaging
55, Boulevard Jules Verger
35800 Dinard / FR
Opponent's representative
von dem Borne, Andreas, et al
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 [2019/22]
Former [2019/18]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger, et al
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
WERIT-Kunststoffwerke W. Schneider GmbH & Co. KG
Kölner Strasse
57604 Altenkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Geskes, Christoph, et al
Geskes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gustav-Heinemann-Ufer 74b
50968 Köln / DE
 03  13.01.2012  18.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
S.A.S Société Nouvelle Sotralentz Packaging
55, Boulevard Jules Verger
35800 Dinard / FR
Opponent's representative
von dem Borne, Andreas, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2014/52]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger, et al
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
WERIT-Kunststoffwerke W. Schneider GmbH & Co. KG
Kölner Strasse
57604 Altenkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Geskes, Christoph, et al
Geskes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gustav-Heinemann-Ufer 74b
50968 Köln / DE
 03  13.01.2012  18.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sotralentz Packaging S.A.S.
3 Rue de Bettwiller
67320 Drulingen / FR
Opponent's representative
von dem Borne, Andreas, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2012/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger, et al
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
WERIT-Kunststoffwerke W. Schneider GmbH & Co. KG
Kölner Strasse
57604 Altenkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Geskes, Christoph, et al
Patentanwälte Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Bonner Strasse 324
50968 Köln / DE
 03  13.01.2012  18.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sotralentz Packaging S.A.S.
3 Rue de Bettwiller
67320 Drulingen / FR
Opponent's representative
von dem Borne, Andreas, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
Former [2012/06]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger, et al
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.01.2012    ADMISSIBLE
WERIT-Kunststoffwerke W. Schneider GmbH & Co. KG
Kölner Strasse
57604 Altenkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Geskes, Christoph
Patentanwälte Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Bonner Strasse 324
50968 Köln / DE
Former [2012/04]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Pansch, Rüdiger
rospatt osten pross Postfach 11 09 35
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
17.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1814/15
17.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.07.2010Request for further processing filed
02.07.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.02.2009
CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU05.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
AT05.02.2014
[2015/25]
Former [2014/38]HU05.02.2009
CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU05.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/34]HU05.02.2009
CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU05.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/27]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
LU05.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/35]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
MT13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY13.04.2011
CZ13.04.2011
DK13.04.2011
EE13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
IE13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
MK13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
PL13.04.2011
RO13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
SK13.04.2011
BG13.07.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/02]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
NL13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
LV13.04.2011
SI13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
IS13.08.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY13.04.2011
FI13.04.2011
HR13.04.2011
LT13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
PT16.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT13.04.2011
NO13.07.2011
PT16.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[XDY]DE10110926  (PROTECHNA SA [CH]) [XD] 1,6-8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-5;
 [Y]CH588387  (METALLURGIE & PLASTIC SA) [Y] 2-5 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 33; figures 1-6 *
by applicantDE10110926