Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2096043 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2096043



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 910
14.01.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.01.2020 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
10.01.2020 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
10.01.2020 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
10.01.2020 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 1
10.01.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
20.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2019 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.12.2019 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.12.2019 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
29.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.11.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
18.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.11.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
18.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.07.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
01.07.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.04.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
02.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.04.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 15
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 13
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 13
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 14
11.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.01.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 3
09.01.2019 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
19.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
14.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
27.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
23.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
22.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
18.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
16.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
05.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2015 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 2
11.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.12.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
03.12.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
17.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
21.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
17.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.09.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.09.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
07.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.05.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.05.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
06.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
05.05.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.05.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
08.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
24.11.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
11.11.2014 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 10
10.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.11.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
31.10.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.10.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.03.2014 General enquiry Opposition 1
30.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
25.01.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
24.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
22.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
22.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
22.06.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
15.06.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
14.06.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
02.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.01.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
13.01.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.01.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.01.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.01.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
04.01.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
04.01.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 15
04.01.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 22
04.01.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 14
04.01.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
23.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
20.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.12.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
16.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.03.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
13.01.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.12.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.12.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.12.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.09.2010 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Description Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.08.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
20.07.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
02.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
02.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.07.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.10.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.07.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.07.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.04.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.04.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 1
06.04.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.02.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
05.02.2009 Description Search / examination 7
05.02.2009 Drawings Search / examination 5
05.02.2009 Priority document Search / examination 17
05.02.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8