Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2096043


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Revocation of patent published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
07.12.2019 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
07.12.2019 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
01.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
29.03.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
22.12.2015 Change - representative
17.11.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
16.09.2015 Change: Appeal number
16.09.2015 New entry: Appeal number
16.09.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
06.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
15.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
21.11.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
12.11.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
19.06.2012 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.02.2012 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
20.01.2012 Opposition filed published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
06.01.2012 Opposition filed published on  08.02.2012  [2012/06]
23.12.2011 Opposition filed published on  25.01.2012  [2012/04]
09.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
02.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
25.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
11.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
28.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
21.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
11.03.2011 (Expected) grant published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
01.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.08.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.07.2010 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
13.07.2010 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
08.07.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.05.2010 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.04.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  05.05.2010  [2010/18]
23.02.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.10.2009 First examination report
14.10.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.07.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
31.07.2009 Request for examination filed published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]