EP2109220 - Method and driver switch for controlling a voltage semiconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMIKRON Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sigmundstrasse 200 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jair, Do Nascimento Am tiefen Weg 24 91077 Dormitz / DE | 02 /
Bode, Rüdiger Erhard-Segitz Strasse 41 90763 Fürth / DE | 03 /
Mühlhofer, Alexander Bahnhofstrasse 53 90522 Oberasbach / DE | 04 /
Hofmeier, Markus Friedrich-Würth-Str. 20 91154 Roth / DE | 05 /
Königsmann, Gunter Graslitzer Strasse 7 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2009/42] | Application number, filing date | 09002486.0 | 21.02.2009 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | DE20081013275 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008013275 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2109220 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2109220 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K4/02, H03K17/16 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H03K4/026 (EP);
H03K17/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Treiberschaltung zur Ansteuerung eines Leistungshalbleiters | [2009/42] | English: | Method and driver switch for controlling a voltage semiconductor | [2009/42] | French: | Procédé et circuit pilote destinés à la commande d'un semi-conducteur | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 14.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 14.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2009 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MK | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.02.2009 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.02.2009 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4266150 (BERGMANN GUENTHER) [Y] 1-4,6,10 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 16; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]US4748640 (STALEY PETER [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,10 * column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 12; figures 2-4 * * column 9, lines 54-61 *; | [A]DE4142338 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6-11 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9944109 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6,11 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 7; figures 9,10 * |