Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2186507

EP2186507 - A liquid pharmaceutical formulation comprising nicotine for the administration to the oral cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
McNeil AB
P.O.Box 941
25109 Helsingborg / SE
[2015/14]
Former [2010/20]For all designated states
McNeil AB
P.O.Box 941
25109 Helsingborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Lindell, Katarina
Skarhult 1325
241 93 Eslöv / SE
02 / Bosson, Bengt
Bankogårdsgatan 47
256 55 Helsingborg / SE
03 / Bergengren, Gunnar
Norra Storgatan 38
267 32 Bjuv / SE
04 / Schlüter, Anette
Singögatan 44
257 32 Rydebäck / SE
 [2010/20]
Representative(s)Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2012/14]Thomas, Philip John Duval
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date09002569.318.12.2002
[2010/20]
Priority number, dateSE2001000438827.12.2001         Original published format: SE 0104388
[2010/20]
Previously filed application, dateWO2002SE0235818.12.2002
[2010/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2186507
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2186507
Date:10.08.2011
[2011/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2186507
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K31/465, // A61K47/10
[2014/52]
Former International [2010/20]A61K9/00, // A61K47/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/20]
TitleGerman:Flüssige pharmazeutische Formulierung mit Nikotin zur Abgabe in die Mundhöhle[2010/20]
English:A liquid pharmaceutical formulation comprising nicotine for the administration to the oral cavity[2010/20]
French:Formule pharmaceutique liquide comportant de la nicotine pour l'administration de la cavité orale[2010/20]
Examination procedure07.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/11]
09.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2015Fee for grant paid
20.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.03.2015Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02793665.7  / EP1458388
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020793665) is  06.09.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.01.2016   
Fertin Pharma A/S
Dandyvej 19
DK-7100 Vejle / DK
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2016/07]
22.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0534/18
27.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200908   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/33]CZ01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
Former [2016/11]CZ01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
Former [2016/09]CZ01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5721257  (BAKER RICHARD W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,10-14,16-19,23-31 * abstract * * column 32; example 33 * [I] 7-9,15,20-22;
 [XI]US6024097  (VON WIELLIGH JOHANNES LUOW KOT [ZA]) [X] 1-6,10-14,16-19,23-31 * abstract * * column 4, line 21 - line 55 * [I] 7-9,15,20-22;
 [X]EP0324794  (FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT RAUCHEN [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-12,28-31 * page 2, line 14 - line 20 * * page 2, line 26 - line 32 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 13 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]GB2255892  (CHARWELL CONSUMER PROD CHARWELL CONSUMER PROD [GB]; UNICLIFFE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-31 * the whole document * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 *
 [XI]  - BECKETT A H ET AL, "Buccal absorption of basic drugs and its application as an in vivo model of passive drug transfer through lipid membranes", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN, GB, (19671201), vol. 19, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 31S - 41S, XP009142973 [X] 1-6,10-13,16,23,24,27,28 * "Experimental"; page 31S - page 32S * * figure 5 * * table 4 * [I] 7-9,14,15,17-22
 [XI]  - BECKETT A H ET AL, "A POSSIBLE RELATION BETWEEN PKA1 AND LIPID SOLUBILITY AND THE AMOUNTS EXCRETED IN URINE OF SOME TOBACCO ALKALOIDS GIVEN TO MAN", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ROYAL PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN, GB, (19720101), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3573, pages 115 - 120, XP009060133 [X] 1-4,6,9-13,16,23,24,27,28 * page 116 * * figures 5a, 5b * [I] 5,7,8,14,15,17-22
 [Y]  - AXELSSON A ET AL, "The anti-smoking effect of shewing gum with nicotine of high and low bioavailability", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORLD CONFERENCE ON SMOKING AND HEALTH, XX, XX, (19750101), pages 549 - 559, XP003000134 [Y] 1-31 * the whole document * * page 549, line 4 - line 6 *
ExaminationUS5955098
 US4579858
 US5656255
 WO9955371