blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2096064

EP2096064 - Document feeding device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.04.2016  [2016/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shingai, Hiroyuki
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
Intellectual Property Dept.
1-1-1 Kawagishi
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP
 [2015/20]
Former [2009/36]01 / Shingai, Hiroyuki
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/20]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2009/36]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date09002765.726.02.2009
[2009/36]
Priority number, dateJP2008005002729.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008050027
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2096064
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2096064
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2096064
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2012
ClassificationIPC:B65H31/02, H04N1/00
[2012/06]
CPC:
B65H31/02 (EP,US); H04N1/0057 (EP,US); H04N1/00604 (EP,US);
H04N1/00612 (EP,US); H04N1/00618 (EP,US); H04N1/0062 (EP,US);
H04N1/00631 (EP,US); B65H2301/33312 (EP,US); B65H2301/42124 (EP,US);
B65H2403/51 (EP,US); B65H2404/142 (EP,US); B65H2405/1117 (EP,US);
B65H2801/06 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/36]B65H31/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2012/42]
Former [2009/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dokumentenzuführungsvorrichtung[2009/36]
English:Document feeding device[2009/36]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de documents[2009/36]
Examination procedure02.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
09.08.2012Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.09.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2015Fee for grant paid
18.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2014
Opposition(s)16.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
09.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0990956  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * the whole document *[A] 4,7;
 [YA]US2006062615  (HORIO TORU [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0079] * * the whole document * [A] 4,7
by applicantJPH01314856
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.