Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2224369

EP2224369 - Method, SOA registry and SOA repository for granting a user secure access to resources of a process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2012
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2010/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Heiko
Mainstrasse 13
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
02 / Harbarth, Juliane
Gross-Gerauer-Strasse 50a
64347 Griesheim / DE
03 / Fröhlich, Andreas
Am Trockenbusch 8
64297 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Schöning, Harald, Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
05 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2010/35]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/36]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2010/35]Wegner, Hans
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date09002851.527.02.2009
[2010/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2224369
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2224369
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/24
[2010/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, SOA-Register und SOA-Speicher zur Gewährleistung eines sicheren Zugangs auf die Ressourcen eines Prozesses für den Benutzer[2010/35]
English:Method, SOA registry and SOA repository for granting a user secure access to resources of a process[2010/35]
French:Procédé, registre SOA et référentiel SOA pour accorder à un utilisateur un accès sécurisé aux ressources d'un processus[2010/35]
Examination procedure27.02.2009Examination requested  [2010/35]
26.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2011Fee for grant paid
15.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2009
Opposition(s)11.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.02.2009
AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
LU27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
LU27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/35]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/22]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/12]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MK07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/08]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
IE27.02.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/07]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
FR29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/42]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/35]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
PL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
SK07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT07.09.2011
BE07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/13]AT07.09.2011
CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US2008047010  (MARCEAU CARLA [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0059] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2008086473  (SEARL KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] *
 [A]  RAVI S SANDHU ET AL, "Role-Based Access Control Models", IEEE COMPUTER, vol. 29, no. 2, (19960201), pages 38 - 47, URL: http://csrc.nist.gov/rbac/sandhu96.pdf, (20090219), XP007907311 [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - line 8 *
 [A]  SANDHU R S ET AL, "ACCESS CONTROL: PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (19940901), vol. 32, no. 9, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 40 - 48, XP000476554 [A] 1-15 * page 42, column 1, line 1 - line 14 * * page 42, column 2, line 57 - line 67 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.312842
ExaminationUS2008235683
by applicantUS2008047010
 US7451071
 EP1850288