Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2098432

EP2098432 - Powertrain for a motor vehicle with two drive directions of equal value [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV
published on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2016/45]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Poeltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Denteler, Frieder
Im Ängerle 14
86720 Nördlingen / DE
 [2009/37]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2016/45]
Former [2012/52]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patentanwälte
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2009/37]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstraße 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date09002919.002.03.2009
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateDE2008101227203.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008012272
[2009/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2098432
Date:09.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2098432
Date:26.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2098432
Date:09.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:B61C9/12
[2009/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/45]
Former [2011/46]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Former [2010/19]
Former [2009/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antriebsstrang für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit zwei gleichwertigen Fahrtrichtungen[2009/37]
English:Powertrain for a motor vehicle with two drive directions of equal value[2009/37]
French:Transmission pour un véhicule automobile doté de deux directions de circulation équivalentes[2009/37]
Examination procedure04.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2010Examination requested  [2011/46]
07.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
23.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2012Fee for grant paid
08.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.09.2013  01.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
 [2013/45]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.06.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
29.04.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.08.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.09.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1508/15
08.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
29.04.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
29.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s)
GB, TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, LT
11.06.2010Request for further processing filed
11.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
SI, LV, DE, TR, SK, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
11.06.2010Request for further processing filed
11.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
11.06.2010Request for further processing filed
11.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2009
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
MK26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
[2017/10]
Former [2015/34]HU02.03.2009
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MK26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2015/32]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MK26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/32]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/08]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/07]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/52]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/47]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/40]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/34]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/26]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE19827580  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [YD] 1,2,4,6,8-10,12 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE857387  (VOITH GMBH J M) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-10,12 * page 2, line 91 - page 3, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE969433  (EISEN & STAHLIND AG) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 111 - line 117; figure 8 *
by applicantDE19827580
OppositionDE19827580
 GB884562
 DE1284801
 DE857387
 DE969433
 DE19827581
 DE1726365U
 DE958200
 US1063874
 DE4307222
 DE1028601
    - ZF Friedrichshafen AG, "ZF-Power on Track (ZF Broschüre)" Messe "Asia Rail Solutions" Hong Kong: (ZF Broschüre), 19.09.2007
    - H. SCHWEICKERT, Voith Antriebstechnik - 100 Jahre Föttinger-Prinzip, HEIDELBERG, SPRINGER VERLAG, (2005), pages 58,94 - 102,103