blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2098452

EP2098452 - Method and device for filling a container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haver & Boecker oHG
Carl-Haver-Platz 3
59302 Oelde / DE
[2009/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Combrink, Alois
Theodor-Naarmann-Strasse 28
59302 Oelde / DE
 [2009/37]
Representative(s)Schütte, Hartmut, et al
BSB Anwaltskanzlei
Am Markt 2
Eingang Herrenstrasse
59302 Oelde / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]Schütte, Hartmut, et al
BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstrasse)
59302 Oelde / DE
Former [2009/37]Schütte, Hartmut, et al
BSB Beethovenstrasse 34
59302 Oelde / DE
Application number, filing date09002924.002.03.2009
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateDE2008101221803.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008012218
[2009/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2098452
Date:09.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2098452
Date:07.10.2009
[2009/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2098452
Date:19.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2009
ClassificationIPC:B65B1/24, B65B39/04, B65B57/18, B65B1/30
[2009/41]
CPC:
B65B1/18 (EP,US); B65B1/04 (US); B65B1/24 (EP,US);
B65B1/32 (US); B65B39/04 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/37]B65B1/24, B65B39/04, B65B57/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befüllen eines Gebindes[2009/37]
English:Method and device for filling a container[2009/37]
French:Procédé et dispositif destinés au remplissage d'une gerbe[2009/37]
Examination procedure30.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/19]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2012Fee for grant paid
07.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2010
Opposition(s)20.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2009
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/32]CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/08]CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/07]CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE02.03.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/52]CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/48]CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/47]CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/40]CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/34]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/26]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2481611  (ARLINGTON MOORE GEORGE) [X] 1,6,8,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7;
 [X]US3533454  (TINSLEY TRAVIS M) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3614850  (BROCHOT CLAUDE) [X] 2,3,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [XA]GB2065591  (HAVER & BOECKER) [X] 1,6,8,10-12,15 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,7;
 [X]GB2154975  (PURPOSE ENGINEERING LIMITED, et al) [X] 2 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8804435U  (HAVER & BOECKER, 4740 OELDE, DE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE3703714  (ERKOMAT OY [FI]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19541975  (HAVER & BOECKER [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *
by applicantUS3533454
 DE3703714
 DE19541975
 WO2008064847
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.