Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2098985

EP2098985 - Secure financial reader architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.10.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
Room 1.03
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/45]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine CA 92617 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tato, Charles
1155 Merrill Street, Apt. 305
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / Youngblood, Gregory
180 Gabarda Way
Portola Valley, CA 94028-7445 / US
03 / Kiang, Rex
2931 Seriana Place
Union City, CA 94587-1539 / US
04 / Wallace, Joseph
460 E Canyon Creek Court
Gilbert, AZ 85295 / US
05 / Buer, Mark
1027 East Betsy Lane
Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US
 [2009/37]
Representative(s)Krott, Michel
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Jehle, Volker Armin
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date09003050.303.03.2009
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateUS20080033422P03.03.2008         Original published format: US 33422 P
US2009039629702.03.2009         Original published format: US 396297
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2098985
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2098985
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00, G07F7/08
[2012/45]
Former International [2009/37]G06Q20/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2013/28]
Former [2009/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sichere Finanzlesegerät-Architektur[2009/37]
English:Secure financial reader architecture[2009/37]
French:Architecture sûre pour lecteurs financiers[2009/37]
Examination procedure19.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/25]
08.05.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
11.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
30.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0487/15
18.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1400906  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0034] - [0082] * [I] 2,3;
 [I]US2008029593  (HAMMAD AYMAN [US], et al) [I] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0 21] - [0048] *;
 [I]US2006190412  (OSTROFF MAURICE [IL]) [I] 1-3,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0034] - [0035] - [0040] - [0050] - [0079] , [0087] , [0091] *;
 [I]US2006124756  (BROWN KERRY D [US]) [I] 1-3,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0045] , [0067] - [0070] - [0083] - [0084] *
by applicantEP1400906
 US2008029593