blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2226707 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2226707



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
13.11.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.01.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.12.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.11.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
22.11.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
19.07.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.07.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
29.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
29.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.01.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
08.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
08.03.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.03.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
08.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
08.03.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.09.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.08.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 4
19.08.2009 European search report Search / examination 3
06.03.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
06.03.2009 Description Search / examination 33
06.03.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2009 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.03.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8