blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2226707


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
04.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
10.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
13.12.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2014  [2014/03]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
15.11.2013 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
06.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.10.2013  [2013/41]
30.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2013  [2013/40]
16.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2013  [2013/38]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
02.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
26.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2013  [2013/33]
24.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2013  [2013/26]
07.12.2012 (Expected) grant published on  09.01.2013  [2013/02]
05.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.12.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.07.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2012 Change - inventor published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
29.06.2012 Change - French title published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
03.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.01.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.08.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.08.2011 First examination report
08.04.2011 Definitive list of designations published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
06.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.03.2011 Request for examination filed published on  20.04.2011  [2011/16]
11.03.2011 Amendment by applicant
06.08.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.09.2010  [2010/36]