Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2063111

EP2063111 - Method of operation of a wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/22]Wind turbine and method of operation of a wind turbine
[2013/25]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2017New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2013/30]
Former [2009/22]For all designated states
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schubert, Matthias
Wilhelmstr. 10
24768 Rendsburg / DE
 [2009/22]
Representative(s)Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Raboisen 6
20095 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Seemann, Ralph
Patentanwälte
Seemann & Partner
Raboisen 6
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/22]Seemann, Ralph
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date09003468.720.09.2005
[2009/22]
Priority number, dateDE2004104603621.09.2004         Original published format: DE102004046036
DE2004105460811.11.2004         Original published format: DE102004054608
[2009/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2063111
Date:27.05.2009
Language:DE
[2009/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2063111
Date:08.09.2010
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2063111
Date:25.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:F03D7/02, F03D7/04
[2009/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Regelung einer Windenergieanlage[2013/25]
English:Method of operation of a wind turbine[2013/25]
French:Procédé de fonctionnement d'une éolienne[2013/25]
Former [2009/22]Verfahren zur Regelung einer Windenergieanlage und Windenergieanlage
Former [2009/22]Wind turbine and method of operation of a wind turbine
Former [2009/22]Eolienne et procédé de fonctionnement d'une éolienne
Examination procedure10.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
02.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.07.2013Fee for grant paid
26.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05790045.8  / EP1792075
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050790045) is  04.06.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.09.2014  28.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  25.09.2014  28.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2015/11]
Opponent(s)01  17.09.2014  28.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  25.09.2014  28.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  17.09.2014   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fritsch, Stephan
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  25.09.2014   
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2014/44]
Opponent(s)01  17.09.2014   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fritsch, Stephan
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
04.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1765/17
14.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
10.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.09.2005
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
TR25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU20.09.2005
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/29]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/25]BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/12]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
AT20.09.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE20.09.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/30]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU20.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
Former [2015/24]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU20.09.2014
Former [2015/22]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU20.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/39]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/37]CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/36]EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
Former [2014/25]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT25.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[XDI]DE10300733  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,7,12,13,17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * abstract * [I] 3-6,8-11,14-16;
 [XA]US4161658  (PATRICK JOHN P [US]) [X] 1,7,17 * column 2, line 43 - line 55 * * column 3, line 18 - line 51 * * column 4, line 13 - line 35 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 35 * * column 7, line 4 - column 9, line 51 * * column 10, line 12 - line 34 * * column 12, line 1 - line 31 * * column 14, line 20 - column 15, line 45 * * abstract * [A] 2,6-8,11-16;
 [XD]DE19844258  (DEWIND TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,7,17 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 3 * * abstract *;
 [XD]EP0847496  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [XD] 1,7,17 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * figure - *;
 [XD]EP1230479  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [XD] 1,6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * figure - *;
 [A]  - LEITHEAD W E ET AL, "ROLE AND OBJECTIVES OF CONTROL FOR WIND TURBINES", IEE PROCEEDINGS C. GENERATION, TRANSMISSION, DISTRIBUTION, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (19910301), vol. 138, no. 2 PART C, ISSN 0143-7046, pages 135 - 148, XP000219783 [A] 1,7,13,17 * page 126 * * page 143 - page 144 *
by applicantEP0847496
 DE19844258
 WO2004077068
 DE10137272
 EP1230479
 EP1230479
 DE10300733