blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2101340

EP2101340 - Electric switch, in particular electric tool switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marquardt GmbH
Schlossstrasse 16
78604 Rietheim-Weilheim / DE
[2009/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Hacke, Frank
Koristrasse 8
78256 Steisslingen / DE
02 / Gabriel, Christian
Hauptstrasse 16
8231 Hemmental / CH
03 / Niklewski, Gerhard
Hofener Öschle 16
78549 Spaichingen / DE
 [2009/38]
Representative(s)Otten, Herbert
Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Großtobeler Straße 39
88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Otten, Herbert
Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Ravensburg/Berg / DE
Former [2009/38]Otten, Herbert
Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE
Application number, filing date09003524.711.03.2009
[2009/38]
Priority number, dateDE2008101392412.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008013924
[2009/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2101340
Date:16.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2101340
Date:03.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:H01H21/10, H01H3/20, H01H9/06
[2009/38]
CPC:
H01H3/20 (EP); H01H21/10 (EP); H01H9/06 (EP);
H01H2009/065 (EP); H01H2300/024 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/38]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Schalter, insbesondere Elektrowerkzeugschalter[2009/38]
English:Electric switch, in particular electric tool switch[2009/38]
French:Commutateur électrique, notamment commutateur d'outil électrique[2009/38]
Examination procedure15.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
21.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2013Fee for grant paid
21.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2010
Opposition(s)04.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.03.2009
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MK03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU11.03.2009
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2016/32]HU11.03.2009
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
BE31.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2016/28]BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MT03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2015/38]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
AT11.03.2014
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2015/09]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
GB11.03.2014
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE11.03.2014
LU11.03.2014
Former [2014/48]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
LU11.03.2014
Former [2014/24]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/23]CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/22]CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/21]CY03.07.2013
DK03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/14]FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
NL03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/12]FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
NO03.10.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/11]FI03.07.2013
HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
NO03.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/10]HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
NO03.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/09]HR03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SE03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/07]SI03.07.2013
NO03.10.2013
Former [2013/49]SI03.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19962002  (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 36; figures 2,3,6 * [Y] 2-9;
 [Y]GB2363520  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 2-9 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 26; figures 12,14,16 *;
 [X]DE19707215  (RYOBI LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figure -; claims 5,6 *
by applicantDE2410871
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.