Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2106095

EP2106095 - Methods and device for enforcing network access control utilizing secure packet tagging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.11.2014  [2014/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.
5 Ha'solelim Street
Tel Aviv 67897 / IL
[2009/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Motil, Kirill
Rotschild 58/B Apt. 5
Petach Tikva / IL
02 / Cohen, Almog
Lochamei Hageto St. 36
Petach Tivka / IL
03 / Sheffer, Yaron
22 Reffidim St.
Tel Aviv 69982 / IL
 [2009/40]
Representative(s)Plicka, Josef
Cermák a spol.
Elisky Peskove 15/735
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2014/09]
Former [2009/40]Plicka, Josef
Cermák, Horejs Matejka a spol. Lawyers and Patent Attorneys Národni 32
110 00 Praha 1 / CZ
Application number, filing date09003927.219.03.2009
[2009/40]
Priority number, dateUS2008005646227.03.2008         Original published format: US 56462
[2009/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2106095
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2009/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung der Netzwerkzugriffskontrolle mittels sicherer Paketmarkierung[2009/40]
English:Methods and device for enforcing network access control utilizing secure packet tagging[2009/40]
French:Procédés et dispositif pour effectuer le contrôle d'accès au réseau à l'aide d'un marquage en paquets sécurisé[2009/40]
Examination procedure27.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
29.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/46]
25.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007143598  (PARTRIDGE CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0067] - [0069] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0080] * * claims 11,12 *;
 [X]US7139679  (MCGREW DAVID [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, lines 30-34 * * column 6, lines 51-54 * * column 6, lines 63-67 * * column 9, lines 36-49 *;
 [A]  - PATERSON ET AL, "A cryptographic tour of the IPsec standards", INFORMATION SECURITY TECHNICAL REPORT, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1363-4127, (20060101), pages 72 - 81, (20060101), XP025173950 [A] 1-15 * sections 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.istr.2006.03.004
by applicantUS2007143598
 US7139679
 EP1463265