Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2107388

EP2107388 - Ultrasound diagnosis apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.05.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385, Shimoishigami
Otawara-Shi, Tochigi-Ken 324-8550 / JP
[2016/32]
Former [2009/41]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation
1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi
Tochigi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirama, Makoto
Intellectual Property Department Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami
Otawara-shi Tochigi / JP
 [2009/41]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/41]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date09004040.320.03.2009
[2009/41]
Priority number, dateJP2008009381231.03.2008         Original published format: JP 2008093812
[2009/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2107388
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/52
[2009/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2010/24]
Former [2009/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Diagnostisches Ultraschallgerät[2009/41]
English:Ultrasound diagnosis apparatus[2009/41]
French:Appareil de diagnostic à ultrasons[2009/41]
Examination procedure20.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/41]
22.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.05.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination19.08.2014Appeal received No.  T2158/14
22.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP14152715.0  / EP2738569
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6231511  (BAE MOO-HO [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-7,9-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 32 * * column 3, line 62 - column 8, line 54 * [I] 5,8;
 [A]US5457996  (KONDO SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  - SVETOSLAV I NIKOLOV AND JO RGEN A JENSEN, "Virtual Ultrasound Sources in High-resolution Ultrasound Imaging", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20020101), vol. 4687, ISSN 1605-7422, pages 395 - 405, XP007906292 [X] 1-4,6-7,9-15 * abstract * * Sections 1, 2, 4, 5 * [I] 5,8
 [XI]  - NIKOLOV S I ET AL, "Parameter study of 3D synthetic aperture post-beamforming procedure", ULTRASONICS, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS LTD. GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 44, ISSN 0041-624X, (20061222), pages E159 - E164, (20061222), XP025009161 [X] 1-4,6-7,9-15 * abstract * * Sections 1-4 * [I] 5,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultras.2006.06.048
 [A]  - LI M-L ET AL, "IMPROVED SYNTHETIC APERTURE FOCUSING TECHNIQUE WITH APPLICATIONS IN HIGH-FREQUENCY ULTRASOUND IMAGING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (20040101), vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 63 - 70, XP001218174 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2004.1320762
 [A]  - SVETOSLAV NIKOLOV ET AL, "Recursive ultrasound imaging", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990101), ISSN 0090-5607, pages 1621 - 1625, XP007906281 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2007323029