Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2237182

EP2237182 - Method, system, license server for providing a license to a user for accessing a protected content on a user device and software module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.10.2011
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony DADC Austria AG
Sonystrasse 20
5081 Anif / AT
[2010/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Augustin, Thomas
Leubestrasse 3
5081 Anif / AT
02 / Kubera, Oliver
Ulrich Schreier Strasse 16/3
5020 Salzburg / AT
03 / Aster, Martin
Thumegger Strasse 21
5020 Salzburg / AT
 [2010/40]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/40]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date09004727.531.03.2009
[2010/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2237182
Date:06.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00
[2010/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, System, Lizenzserver zur Bereitstellung einer Lizenz für einen Benutzer für den Zugriff auf geschützten Inhalt auf einer Benutzervorrichtung und Softwaremodul[2010/40]
English:Method, system, license server for providing a license to a user for accessing a protected content on a user device and software module[2010/40]
French:Procédé, système, serveur de licence pour fournir une licence à un utilisateur afin d'accéder à un contenu protégé sur un dispositif d'utilisateur et module logiciel[2010/40]
Examination procedure25.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/18]
30.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination22.01.2014Appeal received No.  T1041/14
02.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004193546  (TOKUTANI TAKASHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2005185792  (TOKUTANI TAKASHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2002026581  (MATSUYAMA SHINAKO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2003120611  (YOSHINO KENJI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0333] - [0340]; figure 1 *