Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9740843 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2010250389 | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004727 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100109472 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004727 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5948008B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | B2 | JP2010244542 | 28.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004727 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101854245B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B | CN101854245 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09004727 | 31.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2237182 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004727 | 31.03.2009 |