Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2098230

EP2098230 - Implantable device comprising taxol in crystalline form for the inhibition or prevention of restenosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/37]Use of cytoskeletal inhibitors in crystalline form for the inhibition or prevention of restenosis
[2012/06]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.05.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017New entry: Observations by third parties 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Clarendon House
2 Church Street
Hamilton HM11 / BM
[2014/48]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
BOSTON SCIENTIFIC SCIMED LIMITED
The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / Kunz, Lawrence, L.
2114 W.Dry Creek Road
Ellensburg WA 98926 / US
02 / Klein, Richard, A.
20311 Maplewood Drive
Edmonds WA 98026 / US
03 / Reno, John, M.
2452 Elm Drive
Brier Washington 98036 / US
 [2009/37]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Peterreins, Frank , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2010/22]Peterreins, Frank , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2009/37]Sutto, Luca
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date09004768.931.03.1998
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateUS1997082968531.03.1997         Original published format: US 829685
US1997082999131.03.1997         Original published format: US 829991
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2098230
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2098230
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/335, A61L31/16, A61P7/00, A61F2/06, A61K31/337, A61K31/4035, A61K31/407, A61L31/14, A61K31/04, A61K31/131, A61K31/135, A61K31/165, A61K31/17, A61K31/365, A61K31/40, A61K31/4025, A61K31/519, A61K31/551, A61K31/704, A61K47/48
[2012/06]
Former International [2009/37]A61K31/335, A61L31/16, A61P7/00, A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/37]
TitleGerman:Implantierbare Vorrichtung enthaltend Taxol in kristalliner Form zur Hemmung oder Vorbeugung der Restenose[2012/06]
English:Implantable device comprising taxol in crystalline form for the inhibition or prevention of restenosis[2012/06]
French:Dispositif implantable comprénant du taxol en forme cristalline pour l'inhibition ou la prévention de la resténose[2012/06]
Former [2009/37]Verwendung von Cytoskelettinhibitoren in kristalliner Form zur Hemmung oder Vorbeugung der Restenose
Former [2009/37]Use of cytoskeletal inhibitors in crystalline form for the inhibition or prevention of restenosis
Former [2009/37]Utlisation des inhibiteurs cytosquelettiques en forme cristalline pour l'inhibition ou la prévention de la resténose
Examination procedure09.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/11]
11.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2012
18.01.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2012Fee for grant paid
20.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2015Observations by third parties
18.11.2016Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04023674.7  / EP1512398
EP98914366.4  / EP0975340
Divisional application(s)EP10175858.9  / EP2292225
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980914366) is  21.08.2001
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2013   
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte, et al
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2013   
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-Chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys, et al
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
03.05.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1548/15
29.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
CH31.03.2013
GB31.03.2013
IE31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
LU31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/09]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
CH31.03.2013
GB31.03.2013
IE31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
CH31.03.2013
IE31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/07]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
IE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2013/47]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/13]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
IT20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT20.06.2012
BE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
Former [2012/50]FI20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
GR21.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI20.06.2012
SE20.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9211890  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 15-21 *;
 [X]WO9416706  (NEORX CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 14, lines 25-29 * * page 19, line 17 * * page 25, line 32 - page 26, line 15 * * page 19, lines 17-29 * * page 46, line 25 - page 47, line 10 *;
 [X]WO9625176  (NEORX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * claims 1-66 *;
 [Y]  - KUNZ, L.L. ET AL, "Efficacy of cytochalasin B in inhibiting coronary restenosis caused by chronic remodelling after balloon trauma in swine", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOOGY, (1995), vol. 0, page 302A, XP002075725 [Y] 1-44 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0735-1097(95)92711-D
 [X]  - CAMENZIND, E. ET AL, "Use of locally delivered conventional drug therapies", SEMIN. INTERVENT. CARDIOL., (199603), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 67 - 76, XP002075726 [X] 1-13 * page 73, column L, lines 1-21 *
 [Y]  - LEVY, R.J. ET AL, Strategies for treating arterial restenosis using polymeric controlled release implants, NEW YORK; EDITORS GEBELEIN, C. AND CARRAHER, C., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOACTIVE POLYMERS; PLENUM PRESS, (1994), XP002076528 [Y] 1-44 * page 259 - page 268 * * the whole document *
by applicantUS4824436
 US4929602
 US5328471
 JPS471925U
 JPS4714219U
 JPS478533U
 JPS4723394U
 JPS471924U
 JPS474164U
 WO9317121
 EP0639577
 WO9520582
 US4744981
 US4906452
 JPS62164626
 US5015578
 US4935415
 JPH01149791
 JPH01246288
 JPH02258724
 JPH0372485
 JPH01143877
 JPH029819
 JPH03220194
 WO8907105
 WO9109034
 EP0410389
 EP0296110
 JPS63295988
 JPS62240689
 JPS61268687
 JPS62155284
 JPS62155285
 JPS62120388
 JPS63295589
 WO8807045
 EP0323171
 US4897255
 US4835002
 US5362424
 US5364632
 WO9408604
 WO9408605
 WO9419000
 WO9419001
 WO9419003
 US5478860
 US4389330
 US5407609
 US4093709
 US4675189
 US4879225
 EP0411893
 WO8810259
 WO9013293
 WO9003768
 WO9001969
 US5232444
 US5213576
 US5282785
 US5458568
 US4512762
 US5049132
    - POPMA ET AL., AMER. J. MED., (1990), vol. 88, pages 16N - 24N
    - FANELLI ET AL., AMER. HEART JOUR., (1990), vol. 119, pages 357 - 368
    - JOHNSON ET AL., CIRNULATION, (1988), vol. 78, no. II, page II-82
    - POPMA ET AL., AMER J. MED., (1990), vol. 88, pages 16N - 24N
    - FANELLI ET AL., AMER. HEART JOUR, (1990), vol. 119, pages 357 - 368
    - LIU ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1989), vol. 79, pages 1374 - 1387
    - CLOWES ET AL., CIRC. RES, (1985), vol. 56, pages 139 - 145
    - LIU ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1989), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 1374 - 1387
    - GOLDMAN ET AL., ATHEROSRLEROSIS, (1987), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 215 - 225
    - WOLINSKY ET AL., JACC, (1990), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 475 - 481
    - NABEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1342 - 1344
    - MIDDLEBROOK ET AL., RIONHEM. PHARM., 3E, (1989), no. 18, pages 3101 - 3110
    - KINGSTON ET AL., NEW TRENDS IN NAT PROD CHEM.,, (1986), vol. 26, page 219
    - JARVIS ET AL., Chemistry of Alleopathy, ACS Symposium Series, (1984), vol. 268, pages 149 - 159
    - JARVIS; MAZZOLA, ACC. CHEM. RES., (1982), vol. 15, pages 338 - 395
    - BAMBURG, J.R., PROC. MOLEC. SUBCELL. RIOL., (1983), vol. 8, pages 41 - 110
    - SCHLINGEMANN ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL, (1990), vol. L36, pages 1393 - 1405
    - H. KAMBIC ET AL., "Biomaterials in Artificial Organs", CHEM. RNG, NEWS, (19860414), vol. 30
    - MILTON J. ROSEN, Surfactants & Interfacial Phenomena, J. WILEY & SONS, (1978), pages 242 - 245
    - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (1979), vol. 8, pages 910 - 915
    - BHARGAVA ET AL., Pharm. Tech, (198703), pages 46 - 53
    - KAHLWEIT, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 24Q, pages 617 - 621
    - POUTON ET AL., INT. JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (1985), vol. 27, pages 335 - 348
    - OSBOME ET AL., J. NISP. SCI. TECH., (1988), vol. 9, pages 415 - 423
    - POLYMER LETTERS, (1980), vol. L8, page 293
    - COWSAR ET AL., "Poly(Lactide-Co-Glycolide) Microcapsules for Controlled Release of Steroids", METHNDQ ENZYMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 112, pages 101 - 116
    - ELDRIDGE ET AL., "Biodegradable and Biocompatible Poly(DL-Lactide-Co-Glycolide) Microspheres as an Adjuvant for Staphylococcal Enterotoxin B Toxoid Which Enhances the Level of Toxin-Neutralizing Antibodies", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1991), vol. 52, pages 2978 - 2986
    - COHEN ET AL., "Controlled Delivery Systems for Proteins Based on Poly(Lactic/Glycolic Acid) Microspheres", PHARMANEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 713 - 720
    - SANDERS ET AL., "Controlled Release of a Luteinizing Hormone-Releasing Hormone Analogue from Poly(D,L-Lactide-Co-Glycolide) Microspheres", J. PHARMACEUTICAL QCIENCE, (1984), vol. 73, no. 9, pages 1294 - 1297
    - TICE ET AL., "Biodegradable Controlled-Release Parenteral Systems", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, (1984), pages 26 - 35
    - BECK ET AL., "Poly(DL-Lactide-Co-Glycolide)/Norethisterone Microcapsules: An Injectable Biodegradable Contraceptive", BIOI REPROD., (1983), vol. 28, pages 186 - 195
    - BUMOL ET AL., PNAS USA, (1982), vol. 22, pages 1245 - 1249
    - BUMOL ET AL., PNAS USA, (1982), vol. 19, pages 1245 - 1249
    - "Monoclonal Antibody Therapy to Cancer: Preclinical Models and Investigations", MORGAN; FOON, Basic and Clinical Tumor Immunology, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, vol. 2
    - UHR, J. OFLMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, pages I - VII
    - COHEN ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RF-QE:VRCH, (1991), vol. 8, pages 713 - 720
    - LANGE, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 243, page 1527
    - CIRC RES., (199504), vol. 76
    - LANGE, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 24Q, page 1527
    - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., J. APP. POLY. SCI, (1981), vol. 26, page 809
    - STEELE ET AL., CIRC. RES., (1985), vol. 57, pages 105 - 112
    - SCHWARTZ ET AL., CIRC., (1990), vol. 82, pages 2190 - 2200
 US19950389712
otherWO9425020
 WO9418954
 WO9503036
 WO9625176
 WO9211890
    - "DIFFERENT TREATMENTS OF BALLOON CATHETERS- DIFFERENT BALLOON SURFACES", BOSTON SCIENTIFIC JOURNAL REPORT: 90667463/VER.01, (20110324), pages 1 - 2, XP003035717