Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2109071

EP2109071 - Method for controlling a work process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bossert, Daniel
Mühlstrasse 9
71735 Eberdingen-Nussdorf / DE
[2009/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/42]
Representative(s)Riedel, Peter , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei
Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/42]Riedel, Peter , et al
Menzelstrasse 40
70192 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09005137.608.04.2009
[2009/42]
Priority number, dateDE2008101859711.04.2008         Original published format: DE102008018597
[2009/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2109071
Date:14.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00
[2009/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Arbeitsablaufes[2009/42]
English:Method for controlling a work process[2009/42]
French:Procédé destiné à la commande d'un processus de travail[2009/42]
Examination procedure30.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/19]
12.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/31]
18.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2010
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4909648  (HARTMAN G WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 13 * * column 5, lines 48-63; figure 4 * * column 6, lines 17-30; figure 2 * * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 8; figure 2 * * column 11, lines 16-45 * * column 12, lines 28-54; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP1502766  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038]; figures 3a-3b *;
 [A]EP0556071  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5943651  (OOSAWA SATORU [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 62 *;
 [A]US6277461  (NAGANUMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *