Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2239793

EP2239793 - Electrically switchable polymer film structure and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/41]For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Buesgen, Thomas
Johanniter-Strasse 32
51065 Köln / DE
02 / Jenninger, Werner
Zülpicher Strasse 34
50674 Köln / DE
03 / Wagner, Joachim
Semmelweisstrasse 135
51061 Köln / DE
04 / Pfeiffer, Evelyn
Bergische Landstrasse 42
51375 Leverkusen / DE
05 / Maier, Gerhard
Ingolstädter Strasse 1
80807 München / DE
06 / Gärtner, Robert
Römerstrasse 9
82296 Schöngeising / DE
 [2010/41]
Application number, filing date09005280.411.04.2009
[2010/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2239793
Date:13.10.2010
Language:DE
[2010/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/09, F15D1/12, G06F1/16
[2010/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrisch schaltbarer Polymerfilmaufbau und dessen Verwendung[2010/41]
English:Electrically switchable polymer film structure and use thereof[2010/41]
French:Montage de film polymère électrique commutable et son utilisation[2010/41]
Examination procedure14.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/40]
23.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2005157893  (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al) [XD] 1-6,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1A-1E,3A-3E *;
 [X]EP1843406  (TNO [NL]) [X] 1,3-8,11,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]US2006079619  (WANG RUIPING [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE10058069  (AMERICAN METRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] *;
 [A]  AKLE B J ET AL, "Ionic electroactive hybrid transducers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2005), vol. 5759, no. 1, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 153 - 164, XP002533695 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.599983
 [A]  ZHENG CHEN ET AL, "Quasi-Static Positioning of Ionic Polymer-Metal Composite (IPMC) Actuators", ADVANCED INTELLIGENT MECHATRONICS. PROCEEDINGS, 2005 IEEE/ASME INTERNA TIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTEREY, CA JULY 24-28, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050724), ISBN 978-0-7803-9047-8, pages 60 - 65, XP010830305 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AIM.2005.1500966
by applicantUS2008128027
 WO2008105861
 EP1090835
 DE10026264
 WO2005079187
 US7397166
    MRS BULLETIN, (200803), vol. 33, no. 3,
    Y. BAR-COHEN; Q. ZHANG, MRS BULLETIN, (200803), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 173 - 181,