Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2135542

EP2135542 - Endoscope and shaft system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Richard Wolf GmbH
Pforzheimer Strasse 32
75438 Knittlingen / DE
[2009/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Körner, Eberhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Stephan-Gerlach-Strasse 29
75438 Knittlingen / DE
02 / Freier, Mark
Aschingerstrasse 4
75038 Oberderdingen / DE
 [2009/52]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB
Wallstraße 33a
23560 Lübeck / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Hemmer, Arnd , et al
Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstrasse 33a
23560 Lübeck / DE
Former [2009/52]Hemmer, Arnd , et al
Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Bei der Lohmühle 23
23554 Lübeck / DE
Application number, filing date09007594.609.06.2009
[2009/52]
Priority number, dateDE2008102930119.06.2008         Original published format: DE102008029301
[2009/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2135542
Date:23.12.2009
Language:DE
[2009/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2135542
Date:05.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, A61B17/34
[2009/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/52]
TitleGerman:Endoskop- und Schaftsystem[2009/52]
English:Endoscope and shaft system[2009/52]
French:Système d'endoscope et d'arbre[2009/52]
Examination procedure24.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/18]
14.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.06.2012Fee for grant paid
05.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Karl Storz SE & Co. KG
Dr.-Karl-Storz-Strasse 34
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
 [2018/04]
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Weller & Partner
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1438/15
14.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.06.2009
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MK05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE09.06.2013
LU09.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
AT09.06.2014
[2015/51]
Former [2015/34]HU09.06.2009
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MK05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE09.06.2013
LU09.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2015/32]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MK05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE09.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2015/13]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE09.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE09.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/18]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/34]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/28]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/22]CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/12]CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/08]LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0455188  (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,11,14,15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 9 * * figure 1 * [A] 13 [Y] 2,5,7,9;
 [YA]DE19935725  (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [Y] 2,5,7 * column 1, lines 1-39 * * column 3, lines 1-40 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 1,3,6,8,14;
 [YA]DE4444049  (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [Y] 9 * column 1, lines 1-26 * * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 10 * * figures 1,2,6,7,9 * [A] 1,8,14;
 [A]DE202004014828U  (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-8,14 * page 4, paragraph 27 - page 5, paragraph 34 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [PX]DE102007032201  (SCHOELLY FIBEROPTIC GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,5,7,8,11,14 * page 2, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 3, paragraph 22 - page 4, paragraph 34 * * figures 1,6 *
by applicantEP0455188