Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2106790 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2106790



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2441
09.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
05.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.03.2018 Annexes filed during the Appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.03.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.03.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.03.2018 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
26.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
20.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
15.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
15.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 49
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
08.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.02.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 14
26.01.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 9
26.01.2018 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Appeal 5
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 4
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 3
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.01.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 54
26.01.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
11.01.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
11.01.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
18.12.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
12.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
12.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
01.12.2017 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
28.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.11.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.11.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 5
23.11.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 3
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.11.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 2
15.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.09.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.09.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
01.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.04.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
18.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
18.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 26
17.08.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 59
14.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.08.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.08.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 58
14.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 24
14.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 24
14.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 27
09.04.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.04.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 39
01.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 34
18.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2015 Description Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Description Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
18.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
05.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.01.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.01.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.01.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
22.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.01.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.01.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
20.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
21.11.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 20
21.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
21.11.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
06.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
06.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.08.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.08.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 3
13.08.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
13.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.08.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
13.08.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
11.08.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
01.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 6
08.07.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
08.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.07.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 4
03.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.07.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
16.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.06.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
16.06.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
13.06.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
28.05.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.05.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 42
14.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.03.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 43
11.11.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.11.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.11.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2013 Request for documents Opposition 1
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.08.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 132
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 33
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
24.07.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
24.07.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 206
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 75
24.07.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.10.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.06.2012 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
04.05.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.04.2012 Notice concerning a request for amendments/ corrections Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Description Search / examination 1
27.03.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 3
23.12.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.12.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
23.12.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
02.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.12.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
01.12.2011 Description Search / examination 2
01.12.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Description Search / examination 2
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
14.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
14.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
13.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
13.07.2011 Description Search / examination 2
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
13.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
13.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 17
27.05.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.03.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
09.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
09.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
09.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
30.06.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.05.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
15.04.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
23.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.09.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.09.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.09.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
07.09.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
01.09.2009 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Description Search / examination 27
16.06.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Drawings Search / examination 7
16.06.2009 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
16.06.2009 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
18.10.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
18.10.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37