blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2139292

EP2139292 - Methods for synchronizing PDCP operations after RRC connection re-establishment in a wireless communication system and related apparatuses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.07.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.03.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2021Revocation of patentpublished on 25.08.2021  [2021/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Road
Taoyuan District
Taoyuan City 330 / TW
[2015/13]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Rd. Taoyuan City
Taoyuan County / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Wu, Chih-Hsiang
HTC Corporation
No. 23, Xinghua Rd.
Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW
 [2012/23]
Former [2010/01]01 / Wu, Chih-Hsiang
HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Rd.
Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW
Representative(s)Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/23]Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2011/07]Wagner & Geyer
Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2010/01]Hager, Thomas Johannes
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date09008214.023.06.2009
[2010/01]
Priority number, dateUS20080074989P23.06.2008         Original published format: US 74989 P
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2139292
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2139292
Date:09.06.2010
[2010/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2139292
Date:06.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/23]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2139292
Date:19.09.2012
[2012/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2010
ClassificationIPC:H04W76/02
[2010/01]
CPC:
H04W76/19 (EP,US); H04W76/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Synchronisierung von PDCP-Vorgängen nach der Wiederherstellung einer RRC-Verbindung in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem und dazugehörige Vorrichtungen[2010/01]
English:Methods for synchronizing PDCP operations after RRC connection re-establishment in a wireless communication system and related apparatuses thereof[2010/01]
French:Procédés pour synchroniser les opérations PDCP après le ré-établissement de connexion RRC dans un système de communication sans fil et appareils associés[2010/01]
Examination procedure19.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/13]
09.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2012Fee for grant paid
27.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11008366.4  / EP2432293
EP12004150.4  / EP2496040
EP12004151.2  / EP2496041
EP12004152.0  / EP2496042
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Brachmann, Roland W.
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze
Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft
Dietramszeller Str. 22
83624 Otterfing / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/36]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Brachmann, Roland W.
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze
Patentanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 12A
81675 München / DE
Former [2013/47]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Brachmann, Roland W.
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A
81675 München / DE
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2013  11.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Brachmann, Roland W.
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A
81675 München / DE
15.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2020
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
29.01.2021Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2021Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
12.05.2021Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/34]
Appeal following opposition23.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0453/15
23.02.2015Payment of appeal fee
27.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
04.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
05.05.2021Appeal received No.  T0529/21
05.05.2021Payment of appeal fee
12.05.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
04.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201103   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.06.2009
AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
ES06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
LU23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IT23.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
[2019/40]
Former [2015/35]HU23.06.2009
AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
ES06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
LU23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IT23.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/34]HU23.06.2009
AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
LU23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IT23.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/27]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
LU23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IT23.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/24]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
IT23.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/21]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
TR06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/18]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
BE30.06.2013
Former [2013/34]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
DK06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
MT06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
IE23.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
BG06.09.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
PT08.10.2012
Former [2013/12]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
MK06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
PL06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
CZ06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
RO06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
SK06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
IS06.10.2012
Former [2013/09]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
EE06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT06.06.2012
CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
SI06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
HR06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
LV06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
GR07.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY06.06.2012
FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI06.06.2012
LT06.06.2012
SE06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Former [2012/47]LT06.06.2012
NO06.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2005109778  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 2 - page 6, line 6 * * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 16 * * claims 1-40 * [A] 3-16;
 [A]US2006034204  (LEE YOUNG DAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *
by applicantWO2005109778
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.