Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2101536

EP2101536 - Method and apparatus for controlling transmission power in a CDMA cellular mobile telephone system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.01.2017  [2017/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Gilhousen, Klein S.
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
02 / Padovani, Roberto
c/o Qualcomm Inc.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
03 / Wheatley, Charles E. III
2208 Caminito del Barco
Del Mar CA 92104 / US
04 / Weaver, Lindsay A. Jr.
3419 Tony Drive
San Diego CA 92122 / US
05 / Blakeney, Robert D. II.
4171 Worsch Way
San Diego CA 92130 / US
 [2015/48]
Former [2009/38]01 / Gilhousen, Klein S.
c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
02 / Padovani, Roberto
c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego CA 92121 / US
03 / Wheatley, Charles E. III
2208 Caminito del Barco
Del Mar CA 92104 / US
04 / Weaver, Lindsay A. Jr.
3419 Tony Drive
San Diego CA 92122 / US
05 / Blakeney, Robert D. II.
4171 Worsch Way
San Diego CA 92130 / US
Representative(s)Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstraße 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/38]Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date09008217.317.05.1992
[2009/38]
Priority number, dateUS1991070202917.05.1991         Original published format: US 702029
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2101536
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2101536
Date:11.11.2009
[2009/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2101536
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/06, H04B7/26, H04W52/06, H04W52/08, H04W52/10, H04W52/40, H04W52/02
[2015/22]
Former International [2009/38]H04W52/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [2015/48]
Former [2009/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Übertragungsleistung in einem zellulärem CDMA-Mobiltelefonsystem[2009/38]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling transmission power in a CDMA cellular mobile telephone system[2009/38]
French:Procédé et appareil de contrôle d'alimentation de transmission dans un système de téléphone mobile cellulaire CDMA[2009/38]
Examination procedure23.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
19.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2015Fee for grant paid
08.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00125802.9  / EP1094644
EP92912546.6  / EP0584241
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19920912546) is  20.01.1999
Opposition(s)26.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 16
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 17
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 18
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 19
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 20
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.11.2015
BE25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
GR26.02.2016
[2017/03]
Former [2016/39]AT25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
GR26.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
GR26.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
Former [2016/20]ES25.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9107037  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; page 8, line 3 - line 10 * * page 9, line 33 - page 11, line 13 * * page 14, line 21 - line 28 * * page 20, line 33 - page 21, line 22 * * page 22, line 28 - page 23, line 10 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0186684  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 14 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 15 * * column 9, line 13 - line 36 * * column 11, line 28 - column 12, line 32 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO8804498  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 16 - line 30 *
by applicantUS4901307
 US5056109
 US5101501
 US5109390
 US19860921261