Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2166531

EP2166531 - Backlight luminance control apparatus and video display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.05.2014  [2014/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koike, Akira
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / Takaku, Kohichi
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / Kohno, Yoshinori
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
04 / Nagashima, Shinichi
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
05 / Yagisawa, Hideto
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
06 / Yamada, Kodai
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2010/12]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date09008282.724.06.2009
[2010/12]
Priority number, dateUS20080136652P23.09.2008         Original published format: US 136652 P
JP2008032269418.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008322694
[2010/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2166531
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2166531
Date:09.03.2011
[2011/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34
[2010/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung der Rückbeleuchtungsdichte und Videoanzeigevorrichtung[2010/12]
English:Backlight luminance control apparatus and video display apparatus[2010/12]
French:Appareil de contrôle d'éclairage de la lumière de rétroéclairage et appareil d'affichage vidéo[2010/12]
Examination procedure08.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
25.03.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008111784  (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052]; figures 4a-4e *;
 [A]US2005184952  (KONNO AKITOYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0104]; figures 4,5a-5c,6a-6d *;
 [A]JP2007240858  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0104]; figure 25 *;
 [E]WO2009096068  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [E] 1-6 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096]; figures 20-25 *
by applicantUS2008111784
 US2005184952
 JP2007240858