Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2286756

EP2286756 - Surgical manipulator means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVINEON HEALTHCARE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS GMBH
Dorfackerstr. 26
72074 Tübingen / DE
[2011/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schostek, Sebastian
Mohlstrasse 52/1
72074 Tübingen / DE
02 / Prosst, Rüdiger
Alte Weinsteige 26
70180 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Rieber, Fabian
Spittastrasse 2
70193 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Schurr, Marc O.
Im Kleeacker 10
72072 Tübingen / DE
 [2013/13]
Former [2011/08]01 / Schostek, Sebastian
Mohlstrasse 52/1
72074 Tübingen / DE
02 / Prosst, Rüdiger
Alte Weinsteige 26
70180 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Rieber, Fabian
Spittastrasse 2
70193 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Schurr, Marc, O.
Im Kleeacker 10
72072 Tübingen / DE
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Former [2011/08]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09010776.421.08.2009
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2286756
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2286756
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00
[2011/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:Chirurgische Manipulationsmittel[2011/08]
English:Surgical manipulator means[2011/08]
French:Moyens de manipulation chirurgicale[2011/08]
Examination procedure21.08.2009Examination requested  [2011/08]
16.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2013Fee for grant paid
11.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2012
Opposition(s)06.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.08.2009
AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
LU21.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2015/24]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI03.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009054909  (FARRITOR SHANE M [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8-9,14-15 * paragraphs [0083] - [0086]; figures 7a,7b *;
 [XDA]WO2008103212  (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [XD] 3 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0067] - [0069] - [0113]; figures 1a,4a,4b,7c * [A] 1;
 [A]US2007255273  (FERNANDEZ RAUL [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005096502  (KHALILI THEODORE M [US]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [AD]US2009076536  (RENTSCHLER MARK [US], et al) [AD] 1,3 * paragraph [0104]; figure 12 *
by applicantUS5876325
 WO2008103212
 US2009076536