Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2129181

EP2129181 - Mobile communication system, base station apparatus and mobile station apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aiba, Tatsushi
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / Yamada, Shohei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / Katsuragawa, Hiroshi
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2012/29]
Former [2009/49]01 / Aiba, Tatsushi
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / Yamada, Shohei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / Katsuragawa, Hiroshi
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [2009/49]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date09011164.206.06.2008
[2009/49]
Priority number, dateJP2007015256008.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007152560
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2129181
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2129181
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2129181
Date:18.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, // H04W24/10
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:Mobiles Kommunikationssystem, Basisstationsvorrichtung und Mobilstationsvorrichtung[2009/49]
English:Mobile communication system, base station apparatus and mobile station apparatus[2009/49]
French:Système de communication mobile, appareil de station de base et appareil de station mobile[2009/49]
Examination procedure07.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/25]
21.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2012Fee for grant paid
05.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08765266.5  / EP2124459
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080765266) is  26.09.2011
Opposition(s)19.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2008
BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
MC18.07.2012
MT18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
TR18.07.2012
BG18.10.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
MC18.07.2012
MT18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
TR18.07.2012
BG18.10.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2015/13]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
MC18.07.2012
MT18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
BG18.10.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2014/08]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
MC18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
BG18.10.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/34]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
BG18.10.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/23]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
RO18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
SK18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/22]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
CZ18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
EE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/21]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
DK18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/13]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
PT19.11.2012
Former [2013/12]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
SE18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
Former [2013/11]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
LV18.07.2012
SI18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
GR19.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
Former [2013/10]BE18.07.2012
CY18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
HR18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
IS18.11.2012
Former [2013/09]BE18.07.2012
FI18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
Former [2013/08]BE18.07.2012
LT18.07.2012
NO18.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005072073  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0048] * * abstract *
 [A]  - FUKUI N, "Study of channel quality feedback in UMTS HSDPA", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2003. PIMRC 2003. 14TH IEEE PROCEEDINGS ON SEPT. 7-10, 2003, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030907), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1264289, ISBN 978-0-7803-7822-3, pages 336 - 340, XP010681613 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2003.1264289
by applicantJP2005130491