Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2168942

EP2168942 - Method for continuous production of Nitrobenzol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2015/44]
Former [2010/13]For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knauf, Thomas, Dr.
Balgheimerstrasse 89
41542 Dormagen / DE
02 / Racoes, Alexandre
Ulmenstrasse 21
47805 Krefeld / DE
03 / Dohmen, Wolfgang
Adlerstrasse 19
47229 Duisburg / DE
04 / Rausch, Andreas, Dr.
Rubinweg 17
41564 Kaarst / DE
 [2012/22]
Former [2010/13]01 / Knauf, Thomas, Dr.
Balgheimerstrasse 89
41542 Dormagen / DE
02 / Racoes, Alexandre
Ulmenstrasse 21
47805 Krefeld / DE
03 / Dohmen, Wolfgang
Adlerstrasse 19
47229 Duisburg / DE
04 / Rausch, Andreas, Dr.
Fringsstrasse 20
41464 Neuss / DE
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2012/27](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date09011636.911.09.2009
[2010/13]
Priority number, dateDE2008104871324.09.2008         Original published format: DE102008048713
[2010/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2168942
Date:31.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2168942
Date:04.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07C201/08, C07C205/06
[2010/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung von Nitrobenzol[2010/13]
English:Method for continuous production of Nitrobenzol[2010/13]
French:Procédé destiné à la fabrication continue de nitrobenzène[2010/13]
Examination procedure08.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/45]
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2012Fee for grant paid
21.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.03.2013   
Josef Meissner GmbH & Co. KG
Bayenthalgürtel 16 - 20
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Strehlke, Ingo Kurt, et al
Von Rohr
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/19]
Opponent(s)01  28.03.2013   
Josef Meissner GmbH & Co. KG
Bayenthalgürtel 16 - 20
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Strehlke, Ingo Kurt, et al
Von Rohr
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
15.05.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.10.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.12.2014Appeal received No.  T2319/14
24.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
AT11.09.2014
NL01.10.2016
[2017/40]
Former [2016/12]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
AT11.09.2014
Former [2015/32]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MK04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/27]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
SM04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2014/21]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
TR04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/51]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
MT04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/40]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FR01.10.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/34]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
BG04.10.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/33]CY04.07.2012
DK04.07.2012
EE04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
IT04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
RO04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
SK04.07.2012
IE11.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
ES15.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/12]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SE04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/11]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
LV04.07.2012
PL04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
GR05.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/10]CY04.07.2012
FI04.07.2012
HR04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
IS04.11.2012
Former [2013/09]FI04.07.2012
LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2013/08]LT04.07.2012
SI04.07.2012
NO04.10.2012
Former [2012/51]SI04.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US6242657  (KOENIG BERND-MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19539205  (MEISSNER GMBH & CO KG JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0436443  (NORAM ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTO [CA]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0373966  (EVANS COLIN MICHAEL) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO2009002734  (H R D CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2256999
 EP0436443
 EP0771783
 US6562247
 EP0708076
 EP1816117
 EP0373966
 EP0489211
 EP0779270
 EP1291078
 EP0771783
 EP0489211
 EP0436443
 EP0779270
 EP0708076
    - GUENKEL, A. A.; MALONEY, T. W., "ACS Symposium Series", NITRATION, (1996), vol. 623, pages 223 - 233