Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2296302

EP2296302 - Method for cntrolling the center wavelengh of at least one narrow band optical channel WDM transmitting device in a WDM network and corresponding WDM transmitting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVA Optical Networking SE
Märzenquelle 1 - 3
98617 Meiningen / DE
[2015/39]
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
Adva Ag
Optical Networking Märzenquelle 1-3
98617 Meiningen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eiselt, Michael, Dr.-Ing.
An der Gebind 7
99334 Kirchheim / DE
 [2011/11]
Representative(s)Eder, Thomas
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/11]Eder, Thomas
Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date09011653.411.09.2009
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2296302
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04J14/02
[2011/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kontrollieren der mittleren Wellenlänge mindestens einer Vorrichtung zur Schmalband-WDM-Übertragung auf einem optischen Kanal in einem WDM-Netz und entsprechende WDM-Übertragung[2011/11]
English:Method for cntrolling the center wavelengh of at least one narrow band optical channel WDM transmitting device in a WDM network and corresponding WDM transmitting[2011/11]
French:Procédé de contrôle de longueur d'onde centrale d'au moins un dispositif de transmission WDM de canal optique à bande étroite dans un réseau WDM et transmission WDM correspondante[2011/11]
Examination procedure23.04.2010Examination requested  [2011/11]
23.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2547/17
29.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008279557  (PARK CHANG-SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0436202  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 5; figure 1 * * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 46; figure 2 *;
 [A]US6396603  (KIM BYUNG-JIK [KR]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 64 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 55; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002041414  (OGUMA TAKEFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0108]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0116]; figure 11 *
 [Y]  - RANDY GILES ET AL, "Fiber-Grating Sensor for Wavelength Tracking in Single-Fiber WDM Access PON's", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19970401), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 523 - 525, XP011048639 [Y] 1-17 * page 523, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 *
 [A]  - HANN S ET AL, "Uni-lambda bidirectional 10/1.25 GbE access service based on WDM-PON", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20040205), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 194 - 195, XP006021385 [A] 1-17 * page 194, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20040121
by applicantUS2008279557
    - RANDY GILES, "Fiber-grating sensor for wavelength tracking in single-fiber WDM access PON's", IEEE. PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (199704), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 523 - 525, XP011048639