Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2161693

EP2161693 - Jukebox system with central and local music servers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TouchTunes Music Corporation
850 Third Avenue, Suite 15C
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]For all designated states
Touchtunes Music Corporation
850 Third Avenue, Suite 15C
New York NY 10022 / US
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
TOUCHTUNES MUSIC CORPORATION
Suite 107, 1800 East Sahara
Las Vegas, NV 89104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nathan, Guy
201, Chemin du Club Marin
1903 Verdun Nun's Island H3E 1T4 / CA
02 / Dion, Dominique
175, William Paul. Ste.
702, Verdun Nun's Island H3E 1P1 / CA
 [2010/10]
Representative(s)Debay, Yves
Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2
78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
[2010/10]
Application number, filing date09012503.008.11.2005
[2010/10]
Priority number, dateUS2005018597421.07.2005         Original published format: US 185974
[2010/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2161693
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2161693
Date:04.08.2010
[2010/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/30, G06F17/30
[2010/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2010/10]
TitleGerman:Digitales Download-Jukeboxsystem mit zentralen und lokalen Musikservern[2010/10]
English:Jukebox system with central and local music servers[2010/10]
French:Système de jukebox à téléchargement numérique avec serveurs musicaux centraux et locaux[2010/10]
Examination procedure09.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
28.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/10]
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2012Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/10]
14.03.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/10]
Appeal following examination17.04.2012Appeal received No.  T1480/12
21.06.2012Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
10.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05292362.0  / EP1746548
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050292362) is  31.03.2008
Request for further processing for:15.12.2009Request for further processing filed
15.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.01.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
15.12.2009Request for further processing filed
15.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.01.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
15.12.2009Request for further processing filed
15.12.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201006   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19904007  (WEGGERLE ALEXANDER [DE]) [X] 1-18 * column 1 - column 2; claim 4 *;
 [X]GB2380377  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3 - page 8 *;
 [X]US2004220926  (LAMKIN ALLAN B [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0277]; figures 1-3; claims 1-11 *;
 [AD]US2005060405  (NATHAN GUY [CA], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1408427  (TOUCHTUNES MUSIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004205171  (NATHAN GUY [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0089] *;
 [A]US6308204  (NATHAN GUY [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2808906  (TOUCHTUNES MUSIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  Anonymous, "2 sound cards", (20021220), computing.net, URL: http://www.computing.net/answers/hardware/2-sound-cards-at-once/6293.html, (20100610), XP002586601 [X] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [X]  Anonymous, "2 sound cards in 1 machine", (20040817), computing.net, URL: http://www.computing.net/answers/hardware/2-sound-cards-in-1-machine/28190.html, (20100609), XP002586602 [X] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6308204
 US20040023390