blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2177651

EP2177651 - Method for making PTT fibres with improved curling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/16]PTT fibre with improved curling
[2011/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TREVIRA GMBH
Max-Fischer-Strasse 11
86399 Bobingen / DE
[2010/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Bernhard, Kay, Dr.
Trinkbornstrasse 54
64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Dahringer, Jörg, Dr.
Lechallee 49i
86399 Bobingen / DE
03 / Klanert, Michael
Tegelbergstrasse 3
86830 Schwabmünchen / DE
 [2010/16]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2010/16]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner
Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date09012733.308.10.2009
[2010/16]
Priority number, dateDE2008105173815.10.2008         Original published format: DE102008051738
[2010/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2177651
Date:21.04.2010
Language:DE
[2010/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2177651
Date:14.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2010
ClassificationIPC:D01F6/62, D01F6/84, D01D5/084
[2010/16]
CPC:
D01D5/084 (EP); D01D10/00 (EP); D01F6/62 (EP);
D01F6/84 (EP); D02G1/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von PTT-Fasern mit verbesserter Einkräuselung[2011/23]
English:Method for making PTT fibres with improved curling[2011/23]
French:Procédé pour la manufacture de fibres PTT dotée d'un frisage amélioré[2011/23]
Former [2010/16]PTT-Faser mit verbesserter Einkräuselung
Former [2010/16]PTT fibre with improved curling
Former [2010/16]Fibre PTT dotée d'un frisage amélioré
Examination procedure19.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/48]
12.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2011Fee for grant paid
14.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2010
Opposition(s)17.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.10.2009
CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
FI14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
MK14.12.2011
MT14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
SM14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
[2015/32]
Former [2014/34]HU08.10.2009
CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
FI14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
MT14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
SM14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2014/27]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
FI14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
MT14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
SM14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2013/51]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
FI14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
MT14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2013/29]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
FI14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2013/22]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
ES25.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2012/50]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
IT14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2012/49]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
DK14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2012/37]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
PL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
PT16.04.2012
Former [2012/36]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
RO14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
SK14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
Former [2012/35]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
EE14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
IE14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
BG14.03.2012
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
Former [2012/34]CY14.12.2011
CZ14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
IS14.04.2012
Former [2012/28]CY14.12.2011
HR14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
Former [2012/27]HR14.12.2011
LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT14.12.2011
LV14.12.2011
NL14.12.2011
SE14.12.2011
SI14.12.2011
NO14.03.2012
GR15.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT14.12.2011
NO14.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JPH11189938  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] * [A] 1-11 [I] 12-14;
 [XAI]WO0222927  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 12-14 * examples 2-6 * [A] 1-11 [I] 12-14;
 [XAI]US2004146711  (CHANG JING C [US], et al) [X] 12-14 * examples 1-4 * [A] 1-11[I] 12-14
by applicantGB254826
 US3584103
 GB1254826
 US3816486
 US4639347
 US4725635
 US5015789
 WO9857913
 JPH11107081
 JPH11189938
 EP0998440
 EP1016741
 US6277289
 EP1230450
 EP1230451
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.