Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2184416 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2184416



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 127
29.12.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2011 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
17.11.2011 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
11.07.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.06.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.06.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
16.04.2011 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.04.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.01.2010 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
16.01.2010 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Drawings Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Authorisation Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.12.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
01.12.2009 Priority document Search / examination 28
23.11.2009 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 2
23.11.2009 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.11.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
07.11.2009 Description Search / examination 17
07.11.2009 Drawings Search / examination 6
07.11.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
06.11.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
06.11.2009 Description Search / examination 17
06.11.2009 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.11.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8