Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP2184416


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.11.2011 Withdrawal of application published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
03.06.2011 Publication of search report published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
03.06.2011 Change - classification published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
09.04.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.05.2010  [2010/19]