Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2221210

EP2221210 - Fitting for a vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/34]Lining for a vehicle seat
[2011/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2012
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG
Hertelsbrunnenring 2
67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
[2010/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Thiel, Peter
Schulstrasse 7
42899 Remscheid / DE
 [2010/34]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63-65
70193 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63-65
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/34]Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63-65
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09014481.720.11.2009
[2010/34]
Priority number, dateDE2008106335917.12.2008         Original published format: DE102008063359
[2010/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2221210
Date:25.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2221210
Date:30.03.2011
[2011/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2221210
Date:09.11.2011
Language:DE
[2011/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/12, B60N2/20, B60N2/225
[2010/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/34]
TitleGerman:Beschlag für einen Fahrzeugsitz[2010/34]
English:Fitting for a vehicle seat[2011/44]
French:Armature pour un siège de véhicule[2010/34]
Former [2010/34]Lining for a vehicle seat
Examination procedure20.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
08.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2011Fee for grant paid
15.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2011
Opposition(s)10.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
FI09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
HU09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
SM09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
LU20.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
ES20.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
FI09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
SM09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
LU20.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
ES20.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2013/29]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
FI09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
SM09.11.2011
LU20.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
ES20.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2013/25]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
SM09.11.2011
LU20.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
ES20.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2013/22]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
SM09.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
ES20.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2013/14]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
MT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2013/12]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
MK09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/37]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
IT09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/36]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
RO09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
SK09.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/35]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
DK09.11.2011
EE09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
IE09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG09.02.2012
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/34]CY09.11.2011
CZ09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/29]CY09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY09.11.2011
HR09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/27]HR09.11.2011
LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT09.11.2011
LV09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
SE09.11.2011
SI09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT09.11.2011
NL09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
GR10.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
IS09.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT09.11.2011
NO09.02.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19715764  (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 8 - line 51; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE102006003243  (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]DE10105282  (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] *
by applicantDE19715764
 DE102006044489
 DE102008008935
 DE10105282
 DE4436101
 WO0044582
 DE102008029438
 DE4439644
 EP1324896
 EP1474308