Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2333157

EP2333157 - Method for regulating the output of a road finisher or feeder and road finisher or feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Joseph-Vögele-Straße 1
67067 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2014/05]
Former [2011/35]For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Joseph-Vögele-Straße 1
67067 Ludwigshafen/Rhein / DE
Former [2011/24]For all designated states
Joseph Vögele AG
Joseph-Vögele-Strasse 1
67075 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Noll, Tobias
Hainfelder Strasse 3
76835 Roschbach / DE
02 / Weiser, Ralf
Mühlgewannweg 18
68526 Ladenburg / DE
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/05]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2011/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date09014845.330.11.2009
[2011/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2333157
Date:15.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2333157
Date:29.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/48
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Leistungsregelung eines Straßenfertigers oder Beschickers und Straßenfertiger oder Beschicker[2011/24]
English:Method for regulating the output of a road finisher or feeder and road finisher or feeder[2011/24]
French:Procédé de réglage de la puissance d'une finisseuse ou d'un chargeur et finisseuse ou chargeur[2011/24]
Examination procedure03.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2010Examination requested  [2011/24]
16.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2013Fee for grant paid
16.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014   
Dynapac GmbH
Ammerländer Strasse 93
26203 Wardenburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
 02  28.10.2014   
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/49]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014   
Dynapac GmbH
Ammerländer Strasse 93
26203 Wardenburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
 02  28.10.2014   
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
Opponent's representative
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0458/17
02.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0458/17
29.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2009
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MK29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU30.11.2009
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
MT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU30.11.2009
BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
TR29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2016/28]BG29.01.2014
CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
GR30.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2016/22]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
SM29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2016/12]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
AT30.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
IE30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
MC29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
BE30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
BE30.11.2014
LU30.11.2014
Former [2015/24]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SI29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/50]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
SK29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/49]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
RO29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/48]CY29.01.2014
CZ29.01.2014
DK29.01.2014
EE29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/41]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
HR29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
LV29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/39]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
NL29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/37]CY29.01.2014
ES29.01.2014
FI29.01.2014
LT29.01.2014
SE29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
PT29.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT29.01.2014
NO29.04.2014
IS29.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007150166  (MINO HISAHO [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0040] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0055]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JP2002039111  (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [E]WO2010006759  (DYNAPAC GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,8 * abstract *
by applicantWO2010006759
 DE102008058174
 US2007150166
 JP2002039111