Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2333195

EP2333195 - Floor made of floor panels with separate connection components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/24]Floor made of floor panels with separate connection components and method for laying floor panels
[2014/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Barlinek S.A.
AI. Solidarnosci 36
25-323 Kielce / PL
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Konstanczak, Marek
Gwiazdzista 11 Mosczkowo
74-320 Barlinek / PL
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Bischof, Oliver
An den Speichern 6
48157 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Hoffmeister, Helmut
Dr. Hoffmeister & Bischof
Patentanwalt und Rechtsanwalt
Goldstraße 36
48147 Münster / DE
Former [2011/24]Hoffmeister, Helmut
Dr. Hoffmeister & Bischof, Patentanwalt und Rechtsanwalt, Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date09015424.614.12.2009
[2011/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2333195
Date:15.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2333195
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/02
[2011/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
TitleGerman:Fußboden, erstellt aus Fußbodenpaneelen mit separaten Verbindungsmitteln[2014/07]
English:Floor made of floor panels with separate connection components[2014/07]
French:Sol fabriqué à partir de panneaux de sol dotés de moyens de liaison distincts[2014/07]
Former [2011/24]Fußboden, erstellt aus Fußbodenpaneelen mit separaten Verbindungsmitteln und Verfahren zur Verlegung von Fußbodenpaneelen
Former [2011/24]Floor made of floor panels with separate connection components and method for laying floor panels
Former [2011/24]Sol fabriqué à partir de panneaux de sol dotés de moyens de liaison distincts et procédé de pose de panneaux de sol
Examination procedure25.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
31.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
14.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2014Fee for grant paid
16.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2014
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
14.02.2012Request for further processing filed
14.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.12.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MK30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
AT14.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU14.12.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
AT14.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU14.12.2009
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
AT14.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
AT14.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/25]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
AT14.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
IE14.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
LU14.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2009066153  (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU]; CAPPELLE MARK [BE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-12,17 * figures 21-24,30-38, * [I] 14;
 [X]US2003094230  (SJOBERG AKE [SE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,10-13,15,17 * figures 3e,3f *;
 [X]US2008110125  (PERVAN DARKO [SE]) [X] 1-4,8,10-12,17 * figures 5c, 21a-21d,22a-22c *;
 [XA]DE102007032885  (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,17 * figures 4a,4b * [A] 16;
 [XI]WO0020706  (PERSTORP FLOORING AB [SE]; OLOFSSON OLA [SE]; MAARTENSSON GOERAN [SE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,13,15,17 * figures 1a-1c * [I] 16;
 [X]US3627362  (BRENNEMAN JOHN H) [X] 1-3,7,8,17 * figures 10,24 *;
 [A]EP1978179  (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [A] 1,14 * figures 1,2,5 *
by applicantWO2009066153
 WO2008004960
 DE3343601
 US2003094230
 US2008110125
 DE102007032885
 WO0020706
 US3627362
 EP1978179