Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2202470

EP2202470 - Method and system for use of renewable energy sources [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, GB
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
natcon7 GmbH
Borsteler Chaussee 85-99a
Haus 6
22453 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]For all designated states
Natcon7 Gmbh
Borsteler Chaussee 85-99a Haus 6
22453 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Adam, Dirk
Gösselkoppel 31
22339 Hamburg / DE
 [2010/26]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/26]Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date09015779.321.12.2009
[2010/26]
Priority number, dateDE2008106325023.12.2008         Original published format: DE102008063250
[2010/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2202470
Date:30.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2202470
Date:10.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/15]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2202470
Date:15.05.2013
[2013/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:F24J2/40, G06Q50/00
[2010/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Nutzung erneuerbarer Energiequellen[2010/26]
English:Method and system for use of renewable energy sources[2010/26]
French:Procédé et système destiné à l'utilisation de sources d'énergie renouvelables[2010/26]
Examination procedure17.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/30]
09.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2013Fee for grant paid
27.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  10.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
innogy SE
Opernplatz 1
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014  14.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Rieske, Ullrich
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  10.01.2014  06.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vattenfall Wärme Berlin AG
Sellerstrasse 16
13353 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Kekuléstrasse 2-4
12489 Berlin / DE
 [2019/26]
Former [2016/47]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  10.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
innogy SE
Opernplatz 1
45128 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014  14.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Rieske, Ullrich
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  10.01.2014  06.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschkinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Kekuléstrasse 2-4
12489 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/38]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  10.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
RWE Effizienz GmbH
Flamingoweg 1
44139 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014  14.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Rieske, Ullrich
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  10.01.2014  06.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschkinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Kekuléstrasse 2-4
12489 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  10.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
RWE Effizienz GmbH
Flamingoweg 1
44139 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014  14.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Geisel, Clemens
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  10.01.2014  06.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschkinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Kekuléstrasse 2-4
12489 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  10.01.2014  28.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
RWE Effizienz GmbH
Flamingoweg 1
44139 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014  14.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Zipfel, Carsten
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  10.01.2014  06.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschkinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Kekuléstrasse 2-4
12489 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
 02  10.01.2014   
RWE Effizienz GmbH
Flamingoweg 1
44139 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014   
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014  22.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
Opponent's representative
Zipfel, Carsten
Rieske & Zipfel Rechtsanwälte
Klostergasse 3
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  13.01.2014   
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschkinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Schnellerstraße 128
12439 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  09.01.2014   
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
 02  10.01.2014   
RWE Effizienz GmbH
Flamingoweg 1
44139 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  10.01.2014   
Next Kraftwerke GmbH
Lichtstr. 43g
50825 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 04  10.01.2014   
Clean Energy Sourcing AG Leipzig (DE)
Katharinenstrasse 6
04109 Leipzig / DE
 05  13.01.2014   
Vattenfall Europe Wärme AG
Puschinallee 52
12435 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Brandt & Nern Patentanwälte
Schnellerstraße 128
12439 Berlin / DE
20.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.09.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
10.11.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
08.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0234/17
30.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2018
CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
GB21.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SK21.12.2018
HU22.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
SI22.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
BG30.06.2019
GR02.07.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/51]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SK21.12.2018
HU22.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
SI22.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
BG30.06.2019
GR02.07.2019
Former [2019/50]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SK21.12.2018
HU22.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
SI22.12.2018
BE31.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
GR02.07.2019
Former [2019/49]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SK21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
SI22.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
FR31.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/48]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IE21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/47]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
NO31.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/46]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
IT21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/44]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
NL01.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/40]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
MC02.01.2019
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
LU21.12.2018
LV21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
RO21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
PT21.06.2019
SM28.06.2019
Former [2019/35]CY21.12.2018
CZ21.12.2018
FI21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
PT21.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI21.12.2018
SE22.12.2018
PT21.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI21.12.2018
PT21.06.2019
Former [2014/02]deleted
Former [2013/50]LV10.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102004056254  (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2003102675  (NOETHLICHS LEO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014]; figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]EP1801950  (VIRTUTILITY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [X]  - KARSTEN KREISSLER, "100% regelbar Das Regenerative Kombikraftwerk", INTERNET CITATION, (20071012), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://www.gruene-pfalz.de/WordPress/2.22/wordpress/wp-content/kreiss ler_100_prozent.pdf, (20090706), XP007909094 [X] 1-15 * page 6 - page 9 *
by applicantDE102004056254