Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2098224

EP2098224 - Rapidly disintegrating gelatinous coated tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
[2015/47]
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Mcneil-PPC, Inc
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rinker, Roger A.
523 Fairhill Road
Hatfield, PA 19440 / US
02 / Casale, Nicholas J.
9 Willet Drive
Maple Glen, PA 19002 / US
03 / Comly, James H.
410 Brandham Way
Downingtown, PA 19335 / US
04 / Pollock, Brenda
7520 Kirwin Lane
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / Ayer, Atul
931 Bautista Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / Geerke, Johan
473 Arboleda Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
07 / Costello, Martin
5405 Midday Common
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
08 / Wieand, Dennis
2650 Possum Hollow Road
Coopersburg, CA 18036 / US
09 / Parekh, Kishor
33 Greenwoods Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
 [2013/03]
Former [2009/37]01 / Rinker, Roger A.
523 Fairhill Road
Hatfield, PA 19440 / US
02 / Cascale, Nicholas J.
9 Willet Drive
Maple Glen, PA 19002 / US
03 / Comly, James H.
410 Brandham Way
Downingtown, PA 19335 / US
04 / Pollock, Brenda
7520 Kirwin Lane
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / Ayer, Atul
931 Bautista Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
06 / Geerke, Johan
473 Arboleda Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
07 / Costello, Martin
5405 Middayx Common
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
08 / Wieand, Dennis
2650 Possum Hollow Road
Coopersburg, CA 18036 / US
09 / Parekh, Kishor
33 Greenwoods Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Representative(s)Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/37]Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date09075209.816.02.2005
[2009/37]
Priority number, dateUS2004089806123.07.2004         Original published format: US 898061
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2098224
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2098224
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/40, A61K9/44
[2009/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
Former [2009/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schnell zerfallende gelatineartige beschichtete Tabletten[2009/37]
English:Rapidly disintegrating gelatinous coated tablets[2009/37]
French:Médicaments à revêtement gélatineux à désintégration rapide[2009/37]
Examination procedure08.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
29.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Fee for grant paid
18.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05722417.2  / EP1773302
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050722417) is  01.09.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.02.2014  14.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Capsugel Belgium N.V.
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
Opponent's representative
HGF B.V.
Zuid-Hollandlaan 7
2596 AL Den Haag / NL
 [2019/12]
Former [2017/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.2014  14.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Capsugel Belgium N.V.
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
Opponent's representative
Finnegan Europe LLP
16 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EG / GB
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.2014   
Capsugel Belgium N.V.
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
Opponent's representative
Macchetta, Andrea
Capsugel Belgium N.V.
Legal
Rijksweg 11
2880 Bornem / BE
04.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2015
07.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
01.06.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.06.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2029/18
08.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
04.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.02.2005
AT29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU16.02.2005
AT29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
Former [2016/31]AT29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU16.02.2014
Former [2014/14]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
NL29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6126767  (SMITH FLOYD S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 11-24; figure 2; claims 1-9 * [A] 2-11;
 [A]WO9502395  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 21; claims 5-10,15-25 *;
 [A]US4965089  (SAUTER ERICH W [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, lines 2-36; claims 10,11 *
by applicantUS5089270
 US5213738
 US4820524
 US4867983
 US4966771
 US5415868
 US5317849
 US5464631
 US4906478
 US5275822
 US6103260
 US4279926
 US4873231
 US5424075
 US5510385
 US4173626
 US4863742
 US4980170
 US4984240
 US5286497
 US5912013
 US6270805
 US6322819
 US5234099
 US4683256
 US4543370
 US4643894
 US4828841
 US4725441
 US4802924
 US5630871
 US6274162
 US5658589
 US2003070584
 US2003108607
 US2003072731
 US6126767
 US5824338
 US5609010
 US5460824
 US6080426
 US6245350
 US5795588
 US5511361
    - LEIBERMAN ET AL., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms - Tablets, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (1990), vol. 2, pages 213 - 217
 US20040756528
 US20020211139