Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2098224 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2098224



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1001
24.01.2020 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.12.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
11.12.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
06.12.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
02.10.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 19
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.09.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
25.09.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
21.08.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.08.2019 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 2
24.07.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.07.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
10.07.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
05.07.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.03.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
21.02.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
21.02.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
19.02.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
19.02.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
19.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.02.2019 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
11.10.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
17.08.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.08.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.08.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.07.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
23.07.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
17.07.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 3
13.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
01.06.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
01.06.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 19
01.06.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.06.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
01.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
01.06.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.04.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.03.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
16.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
06.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.02.2018 Claims Opposition 2
06.02.2018 Claims Opposition 2
06.02.2018 Claims Opposition 2
06.02.2018 Claims Opposition 2
06.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.02.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
11.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.09.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
11.09.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
05.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.09.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.09.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
18.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.08.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.08.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.08.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
02.08.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.08.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.11.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
17.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
12.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.11.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
06.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
06.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
06.11.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
19.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
09.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 4
06.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
05.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.08.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
03.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.05.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
16.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
04.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
18.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
19.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.08.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.08.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.04.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.04.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.05.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2013 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
24.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.04.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
18.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2013 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 1
18.12.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.12.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.12.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.12.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
18.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Description Search / examination 26
18.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.10.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.2010 Description Search / examination 26
07.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.08.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.06.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
09.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.08.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.07.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of a new European search report (correction) Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 1
25.06.2009 European search report Search / examination 4
29.05.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.05.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.05.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
15.05.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
29.04.2009 Description Search / examination 45
29.04.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
29.04.2009 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 9
20.03.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57