Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2098224


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.07.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.02.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.10.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.08.2018 Change: Appeal number
11.08.2018 New entry: Appeal number
11.08.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
31.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
31.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.09.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
10.08.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2017 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2017 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
01.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
24.11.2015 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
16.10.2015 Change - applicant published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
19.05.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.05.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
05.05.2015 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
05.05.2015 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
28.03.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.08.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
04.04.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
14.02.2014 Opposition filed published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
26.04.2013 (Expected) grant published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
26.04.2013 Change - applicant published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
24.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.12.2012 Change - inventor published on  16.01.2013  [2013/03]
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.12.2010 Change - designated states published on  19.01.2011  [2011/03]
08.10.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.08.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.03.2010 First examination report
12.03.2010 Request for examination filed published on  14.04.2010  [2010/15]
20.02.2010 Change: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.08.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
15.05.2009 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.05.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit