Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2199539

EP2199539 - Self adaptive cement systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.09.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-90
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  LI  LU  MC  PT  SE 
Prad Research And Development Ltd
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town
Tortola / VG
[N/P]
Former [2010/25]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-90
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chamber Road Town
Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  LI  LU  MC  PT  SE 
Prad Research And Development Ltd
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town
Tortola / VG
Inventor(s)01 / Le Roy-Delage Sylvaine
15 rue Dulac
75015 Paris / FR
02 / Guillot Dominique
5 rue Leon Bloy
92260 Fontenay aux roses / FR
03 / Dismuke Keith
2230 Long Cove Circle, Katy
TX 77450 / US
04 / Nelson Erik
10610 Willowisp Drive
TX 77035 / US
 [2010/29]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/25]Vandermolen, Mathieu
Etudes et Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09075541.414.05.2004
[2010/25]
Priority number, dateUS20030470341P14.05.2003         Original published format: US 470341 P
[2010/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2199539
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/02, C04B40/06, C09K8/467
[2011/40]
Former International [2010/25]E21B33/13, C04B28/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/25]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Zirkulationsverlusten[2010/25]
English:Self adaptive cement systems[2010/25]
French:Systèmes de ciment auto-adaptable pour le traitement des pertes de fluides[2010/25]
Examination procedure02.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
16.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/20]
22.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
31.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination02.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0654/17
02.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04732993.3  / EP1625279
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040732993) is  19.01.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
12.04.2011Request for further processing filed
12.04.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LU, IT, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
12.04.2011Request for further processing filed
12.04.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.03.2011Request for further processing filed
16.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
18.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[IY]US3487038  (TOY LEONARD E, et al) [I] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 6-11;
 [IY]US5456751  (ZANDI IRAJ [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * column 3, line 10 - line 20 * [Y] 6-11;
 [IY]US3558335  (MESSENGER JOSEPH U) [I] 1 * column 3, line 25 - line 60 * [Y] 6-11;
 [Y]JPH09156980  ;
 [Y]ZA9100876
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 34, Database accession no. 1997-369241, XP002303649 & JPH09156980 A 19970617 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD) [Y] 6-11 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 9, Database accession no. 1992-072444, XP002296443 & ZA9100876 A 19911224 (SNASHALL H T) [Y] 6-11 * abstract *
by applicantUS6296057
 US6458198
 EP1129047
 WO0037387
 WO0170646
 US5575841
 US5660624
 US5989334
 US6261360
 US6527849
    - DRY, C. M., "Three designs for the internal release of sealants, adhesives, and waterproofing chemicals into concrete to reduce permeability", CEMENT AND CONCRETE RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 30, pages 1969 - 1977
 WO2003EP01578