Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2168974 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2168974



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2157
31.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.10.2018 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
19.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 31
16.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
10.07.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
10.07.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
29.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
28.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.06.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.06.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 4
18.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.06.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
06.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
07.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
02.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.05.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 36
26.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.02.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.01.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 4
16.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.01.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
10.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.01.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
08.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
21.12.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Claims Appeal 1
28.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.11.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
28.11.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.11.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.11.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.11.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 54
13.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
08.09.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.09.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 49
20.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
06.07.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
17.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
12.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
12.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
11.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.05.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.05.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.05.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.04.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
27.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
02.03.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.03.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 25
02.03.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
02.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.03.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.01.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
26.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Claims Opposition 1
26.01.2017 Description Opposition 7
26.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
22.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.12.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
19.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Claims Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Claims Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Claims Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Claims Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 15
24.06.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.06.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
22.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
22.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
21.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
19.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.10.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 39
01.09.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
09.06.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
09.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.06.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
27.05.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.04.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
02.04.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
02.04.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.04.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.04.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.04.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.12.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
02.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 21
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 23
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 28
08.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
08.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 26
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.07.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 38
07.07.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.07.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
07.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
02.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
02.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
02.07.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.06.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
17.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.04.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.04.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
10.12.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 33
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.11.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
11.11.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
04.11.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
23.10.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
23.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.10.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.10.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
21.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 12
21.10.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 6
15.10.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 68
09.10.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 4
02.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
01.10.2013 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 32
01.10.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 12
01.10.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 22
06.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.09.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
06.09.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.09.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 26
06.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 23
09.04.2013 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 8
22.03.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 5
22.03.2013 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
22.03.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
22.03.2013 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 6
18.03.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.03.2013 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
22.02.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
14.02.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
04.02.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.02.2013 European search report Search / examination 3
15.03.2012 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 8
17.02.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
26.01.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
26.01.2012 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 3
16.01.2012 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 13
05.07.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 13
03.03.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.03.2009 Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed Search / examination 1
08.01.2009 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
06.01.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.01.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
06.01.2009 Description Search / examination 9
06.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.01.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3
19.02.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14