Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2261088

EP2261088 - Method and control device for the classification of a crash of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2014
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Volvo Car Corporation
405 31 Göteborg / SE
[2011/38]
Former [2010/50]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn
Michigan 48126-2490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rauh, Christian
/ Kruener Platz 24
81377, Muenchen / DE
02 / Becker, Jens
/ Heinestr. 11
70597, Stuttgart / DE
03 / Nilsson, Paer
/ Kobersgatan 19
41671, Goeteborg / SE
04 / Lich, Thomas
/ Tribergle 33/2
71409, Schwaikheim / DE
05 / Moldenhauer, Maike
/ Birkenwaldweg 3
71111, Waldenbuch / DE
06 / Wogel, Anders
/ Lilla Aelsjoevaegen 45
42470, Olofstorp / SE
07 / Doerr, Alfons
/ Orplidstr. 8
70597, Stuttgart / DE
08 / Axelsson, Anders
/ Torslanda Haesteviksvaeg 49
42341, Torslanda / SE
09 / Harda[deg], Peter
/ Dr Westrings Gata 21 N
41324, Goeteborg / SE
10 / Rittler, Stephan
/ Gerundweg 9
73660, Urbach / DE
11 / Hiemer, Marcus
/ Sammletshofer Str. 25
88074, Kehlen / DE
 [2013/12]
Former [2010/50]01 / Rauh, Christian
Kruener Platz 24
81377, Muenchen / DE
02 / Becker, Jens
Heinestr. 11
70597, Stuttgart / DE
03 / Nilsson, Paer
Kobersgatan 19
41671, Goeteborg / SE
04 / Lich, Thomas
Tribergle 33/2
71409, Schwaikheim / DE
05 / Moldenhauer, Maike
Birkenwaldweg 3
71111, Waldenbuch / DE
06 / Wogel, Anders
Lilla Aelsjoevaegen 45
42470, Olofstorp / SE
07 / Doerr, Alfons
Orplidstr. 8
70597, Stuttgart / DE
08 / Axelsson, Anders
Torslanda Haesteviksvaeg 49
42341, Torslanda / SE
09 / Harda[deg], Peter
Dr Westrings Gata 21 N
41324, Goeteborg / SE
10 / Rittler, Stephan
Gerundweg 9
73660, Urbach / DE
11 / Hiemer, Marcus
Sammletshofer Str. 25
88074, Kehlen / DE
Representative(s)Vogt, Alexander
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Elektronik
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]Vogt, Alexander
Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Elektronik Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09100325.110.06.2009
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2261088
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2261088
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/0136
[2010/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Steuerungsvorrichtung zur Einstufung eines Aufpralls bei einem Fahrzeug[2010/50]
English:Method and control device for the classification of a crash of a vehicle[2010/50]
French:Procédé et dispositif de contrôle pour la classification de collision d'un véhicule[2010/50]
Examination procedure27.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
16.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2013Fee for grant paid
22.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2011
Opposition(s)02.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.06.2009
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MK20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
LU10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
FR01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
[2015/38]
Former [2015/34]HU10.06.2009
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MK20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
LU10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
FR01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2015/32]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MK20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
FR01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2015/13]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
MT20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
FR01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/24]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
FR01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/21]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GB20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
IE10.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/11]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
IT20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/08]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
RO20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
IS20.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/41]FI20.03.2013
HR20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/38]FI20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
LV20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.03.2013
LT20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/36]LT20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
NO20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.03.2013
NO20.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2442987  (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 10 - line 13 * * page 1, line 24 - line 26 * * page 5, line 11 - page 13, line 19; figures 1-8 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2003236604  (LU JIANBO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19651123  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2005036108  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19632836  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
by applicantWO2008048159