EP2088161 - Method for producing polymer beads of uniform size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finch, John David 4504 Congress Court North Wales, NJ 19454 / US | 02 /
Sarafinas, Aaron 120 Grasshopper Drive Ivyland, PA 18974 / US | 03 /
Jiang, Biwang 145 Redstone Drive Warrington, PA 18976 / US | 04 /
Savo, Andrew 1696 Blue Jay Lane Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/33] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas Europe Services ApS - UK Branch European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street London EC4Y 0AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09150013.2 | 02.01.2009 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | US20080010444P | 09.01.2008 Original published format: US 10444 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088161 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2088161 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/18 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C08F2/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01J39/20 (EP,US);
B01J41/14 (EP,US);
C08F2/12 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08J3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2309/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, RO [2010/16] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polymerperlen gleicher Grösse | [2009/33] | English: | Method for producing polymer beads of uniform size | [2009/33] | French: | Procédé de production de billes de polymère de taille uniforme | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0051210 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 3 * * page 9, lines 24-26 * * page 12, lines 22,23 * * page 13, lines 29-31 * * page 14, lines 3,4 * * page 19, lines 4-6 * * page 20, lines 4-8 * * page 24, line 14 * * page 22, lines 23-27 * * page 24, line 23 * * page 28, lines 6,7 ** example 1 * | by applicant | US2800458 | US3922255 | US4427794 | US4444961 | US4623706 | US4666673 |