Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2206879

EP2206879 - Annular barrier and annular barrier system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018Change - applicantpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Welltec Oilfield Solutions AG
Baarerstrasse 139
6300 Zug / CH
[2019/02]
Former [2010/28]For all designated states
Welltec A/S
Gydevang 25
3450 Allerød / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Hazel, Paul
North Skelmonae
Ellon
Aberdeen, AB41/7JQ / GB
02 / Hallundbaek, Jorgen
Haregabsvej 15
Esbonderup Skovhuse
3230 Graested / DK
 [2013/26]
Former [2013/17]01 / Hazel, Paul
North Skelmonae
Ellon
Aberdeen, AB41/7JQ / GB
02 / Hallundbaek, Jorgen
Haregabsvej 15
Esbonderup Skovhuse
3230 Graested / DK
Former [2010/28]01 / Hazel, Paul
North Skelmonae Ellon
Aberdeen, AB41/7JQ / GB
Representative(s)Hoffmann Dragsted A/S
Rådhuspladsen 16
1550 Copenhagen V / DK
[2014/09]
Former [2010/28]Hoffmann Dragsted
Rådhuspladsen 16
1550 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date09150385.412.01.2009
[2010/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2206879
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2206879
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/12, E21B33/128, E21B43/10
[2010/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/28]
TitleGerman:Ringförmige Sperre und ringförmiges Absperrungssystem[2010/28]
English:Annular barrier and annular barrier system[2010/28]
French:Barrière annulaire et système à barrière annulaire[2010/28]
Examination procedure30.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/01]
08.06.2011Observations by third parties
10.06.2011Observations by third parties
12.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2014Fee for grant paid
09.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2014  13.11.2017  WITHDRAWN
Saltel Industries
Rue Siméon Poisson
Campus de Ker Lann
35170 Bruz / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 [2017/51]
Former [2015/02]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2014  01.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Saltel Industries
Rue Siméon Poisson
Campus de Ker Lann
35170 Bruz / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
09.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1775/17
12.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MK26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2017/03]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/28]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/39]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
LU12.01.2015
Former [2015/24]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US6325144  (TURLEY ROCKY A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 28 - line 65; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005161232  (PATEL DINESH R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 1, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 30; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007114016  (BREZINSKI MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 6, paragraph 67 - page 7, paragraph 69; figures 6-9 * * page 9, paragraph 83 - paragraph 84; figures 15,16 * * page 10, paragraph 91 - paragraph 95; figures 24,25 *;
 [A]US2006260820  (WHITSITT JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 3, paragraph 46 - page 4, paragraph 50; figures 3-5,7 *;
 [A]US4499947  (ZSOKA ISTVAN [HU], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 34 - line 44; figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]US6640893  (RUMMEL FRITZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS7306033
by applicantUS6325144
 US6640893
otherUS7306033
 GB2398312
 US5271469
 US4714117