Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2206879 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2206879



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1156
17.10.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
11.12.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
13.11.2018 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
12.11.2018 Important information concerning EPO Form 1010 Appeal 1
06.11.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
26.10.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 4
17.11.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
17.11.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
16.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.11.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
10.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.11.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.10.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.10.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.10.2017 Claims Appeal 3
12.10.2017 Claims Appeal 3
12.10.2017 Claims Appeal 1
12.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.10.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
10.10.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.09.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.09.2017 Request for acceleration of appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.08.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.08.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.08.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.08.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
02.06.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
02.06.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
02.06.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
02.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.06.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.05.2017 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
11.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.04.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
10.04.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
06.04.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
08.08.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.08.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
19.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.05.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
09.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.01.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.12.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
25.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.02.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
24.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.05.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 19
17.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
17.05.2013 Description Search / examination 20
17.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
17.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.12.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
10.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 21
10.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 9
10.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 74
10.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
08.06.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
08.06.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 24
08.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 74
08.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
07.06.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 74
07.06.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
30.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.11.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
30.11.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.11.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
30.11.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.07.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.06.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.07.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
12.01.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.01.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
12.01.2009 Description Search / examination 19
12.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.01.2009 Drawings Search / examination 11
12.01.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4