Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2206879


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.12.2018 Change - applicant published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Opposition withdrawn published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
16.10.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
11.08.2017 Change: Appeal number
11.08.2017 New entry: Appeal number
11.08.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
01.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
17.08.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
16.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
18.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
21.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.09.2015  [2015/39]
19.05.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
09.01.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
05.12.2014 Opposition filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
24.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
24.01.2014 Change - inventor published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
22.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.05.2013 Change - inventor published on  26.06.2013  [2013/26]
22.03.2013 Change - inventor published on  24.04.2013  [2013/17]
15.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.04.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.12.2011 First examination report
17.06.2011 New entry: Observations by third parties
18.02.2011 Definitive list of designations published on  23.03.2011  [2011/12]
03.12.2010 Amendment by applicant
03.12.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2010 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2011  [2011/01]
11.06.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]