Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2206879 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09150385 EP10700124



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10202819Global Dossier 12.02.2019B2
US2017328170 16.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414318824 30.06.2014
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
US201113138139 12.07.2011
EP09150385 12.01.2009
US201715668784 04.08.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9745819Global Dossier 29.08.2017B2
US2014311751 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414318824 30.06.2014
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
US201113138139 12.07.2011
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9080415Global Dossier 14.07.2015B2
US2011266004 03.11.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2391796Global Dossier 25.02.2015B1
EP2391796 07.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP10700124 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2853370Global Dossier 20.06.2017C
CA2853370 15.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
CA2746015 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2746015Global Dossier 06.09.2016C
CA2746015 15.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010204282B 04.07.2013B2
AU2010204282 23.06.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI1006151 23.02.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR122014014688 22.03.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
BRPI1006151 12.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102272413B 02.07.2014B
CN102272413 07.12.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104100225B 29.03.2017B
CN104100225 15.10.2014A
Priority number Date
CN201080004299 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK178851B 27.03.2017B1
DK201070395 13.09.2010A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK201600758 13.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
DKPA201070395 13.09.2010
DKPA201600758 09.12.2016
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2011006115 24.06.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2010EP50298 12.01.2010
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010079237Global Dossier 15.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2206879Global Dossier 26.02.2014B1
EP2206879 14.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP09150385 12.01.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2464457T 02.06.2014T3
Priority number Date
EP09150385 12.01.2009