Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2053047 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2053047



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 34
26.03.2010 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
07.12.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 3
06.05.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.04.2009 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
01.04.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 2
13.03.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
30.01.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Description Search / examination 6
30.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
30.01.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5